EP2423518 - Method for producing a nail connection between two joint parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hußmann, Dominik, Dr. Am Brühl 1 85110 Kipfenberg / DE | 02 /
Schlegelmilch, Robert Hohe Felstraße 1d 98529 Suhl / DE | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Patzelt, Heike Anna Maria AUDI AG Patentabteilung Postfach 11 44 74148 Neckarsulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Patzelt, Heike Anna Maria AUDI AG Patentabteilung Postfach 11 44 74148 Neckarsulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 11006741.0 | 18.08.2011 | [2012/09] | Priority number, date | DE20101035950 | 31.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010035950 | [2012/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2423518 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2423518 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2423518 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16B19/14, F16B5/04 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
F16B19/14 (EP);
F16B5/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/09] | F16B19/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Nagelverbindung zwischen wenigstens zwei Fügeteilen | [2012/09] | English: | Method for producing a nail connection between two joint parts | [2012/09] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une liaison par clous entre au moins deux éléments d'assemblage | [2012/09] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 09.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2011 | AL | 02.07.2014 | CY | 02.07.2014 | CZ | 02.07.2014 | DK | 02.07.2014 | EE | 02.07.2014 | FI | 02.07.2014 | HR | 02.07.2014 | LT | 02.07.2014 | LV | 02.07.2014 | MC | 02.07.2014 | MK | 02.07.2014 | MT | 02.07.2014 | NL | 02.07.2014 | PL | 02.07.2014 | RO | 02.07.2014 | RS | 02.07.2014 | SI | 02.07.2014 | SK | 02.07.2014 | SM | 02.07.2014 | TR | 02.07.2014 | IE | 18.08.2014 | LU | 18.08.2014 | BE | 31.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | BG | 02.10.2014 | NO | 02.10.2014 | GR | 03.10.2014 | IS | 02.11.2014 | PT | 03.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 18.08.2011 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MK | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
SM | 02.07.2014 | ||
TR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 18.08.2011 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
SM | 02.07.2014 | ||
TR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.08.2011 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
SM | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
SM | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
SM | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 02.07.2014 | |
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 02.07.2014 | |
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 02.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006019786 (MURTHA JAMES [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0084]; figures 11-14 * [I] 2-14; | [XI]AU486273B (OLIN CORP) [X] 1 * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 1; figures 4-6 * [I] 2-14; | [XI]FR2610375 (PROSPECTION & INVENTIONS [FR]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 19 - page 7, line 11; figures 1-7 * [I] 2-14; | [XI]DE4339840 (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 12 - line 60; figures 1-3 * [I] 2-14 | by applicant | DE102006002238 |