12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
12.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] |
05.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] |
07.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
20.01.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
25.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
28.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
29.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
12.02.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
16.01.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.01.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
18.10.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.10.2015 |
Change - German title |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
09.10.2015 |
Change - English title |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
09.10.2015 |
Change - French title |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
26.08.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.05.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
29.05.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
29.11.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.11.2014 |
Publication of search report |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
07.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
07.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
13.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.03.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] |