EP2423594 - Method for monitoring a fuel-air device, in particular a heating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/09] | Method and device for monitoring a fuel-air device, in particular a heating device | ||
[2015/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2012/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wodke, Matthias Oberwall 70 42289 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
Wriske, Jochen Adam-Stegerwald-Strasse 26 42857 Remscheid / DE | 03 /
Hietkamp, Albert Saffierdreef 16 7828 BB-Emmen / NL | 04 /
Munsterhuis, Wim Kymmelskampen 44 7751 GP Dalen / NL | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Hocker, Thomas Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2016/11] |
Former [2012/09] | Hocker, Thomas Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 11006748.5 | 18.08.2011 | [2012/09] | Priority number, date | DE20101035687 | 27.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010035687 | AT20110000267 | 01.03.2011 Original published format: AT 2672011 | [2012/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2423594 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2423594 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2423594 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/00, F23N1/02 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
F23N1/022 (EP);
F23N5/003 (EP);
F23N1/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2012/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Überwachen eines Brenngas-Luft-Verbundes insbesondere eines Heizgerätes | [2015/46] | English: | Method for monitoring a fuel-air device, in particular a heating device | [2015/46] | French: | Procédé de surveillance d'un dispositif combustible-air, notamment d'un appareil de chauffage | [2015/46] |
Former [2012/09] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Überwachen eines Brenngas-Luft-Verbundes insbesondere eines Heizgerätes | ||
Former [2012/09] | Method and device for monitoring a fuel-air device, in particular a heating device | ||
Former [2012/09] | Procédé et dispositif de surveillance d'un dispositif combustible-air, notamment d'un appareil de chauffage | Examination procedure | 20.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 19.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2011 | AL | 16.03.2016 | CY | 16.03.2016 | DK | 16.03.2016 | EE | 16.03.2016 | FI | 16.03.2016 | HR | 16.03.2016 | LT | 16.03.2016 | LV | 16.03.2016 | MC | 16.03.2016 | MK | 16.03.2016 | MT | 16.03.2016 | RO | 16.03.2016 | RS | 16.03.2016 | SE | 16.03.2016 | SI | 16.03.2016 | SM | 16.03.2016 | TR | 16.03.2016 | BG | 16.06.2016 | NO | 16.06.2016 | GR | 17.06.2016 | IS | 16.07.2016 | PT | 18.07.2016 | IE | 18.08.2016 | LU | 18.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | FR | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 18.08.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
MT | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.08.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.08.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | DK | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | DK | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | DK | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0697565 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, lines 12-21 * | by applicant | DE10319835 |