EP2392583 - RNAi modulation of Aha and therapeutic uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alnylam Europe AG. 300 Third Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | For all designated states The Scripps Research Institute Mail Drop TPC-8 10550 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla CA 92037 / US | [2011/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Constien, Rainer c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Third Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 02 /
Bramlage, Birgit c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Third Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 03 /
Tan, Pamela c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Third Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 04 /
Vornlocher, Hans-Peter c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Third Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 05 /
Balch, William 4037 Grayson Drive San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11006765.9 | 18.05.2007 | [2011/49] | Priority number, date | US20060801840P | 19.05.2006 Original published format: US 801840 P | [2011/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2392583 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/04, C12N15/113 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/49] | Title | German: | RNAi-Modulation von AHA und therapeutische Verwendungen davon | [2011/49] | English: | RNAi modulation of Aha and therapeutic uses thereof | [2011/49] | French: | Modulation ARNi de AHAS et utilisations thérapeutiques associées | [2011/49] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 24.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/50] | 23.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/50] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07797577.9 / EP2023937 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03070918 (RIBOZYME PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 19, paragraph 2 * * page 26, paragraph 1 - page 28, paragraph 1 * * page 97, paragraph 6 *; | [A]WO2005044981 (SIRNA THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 18, paragraph 1 * * page 34, lines 12-26 * * page 52, line 1 - page 53, line 21 * * page 126, paragraph 1 * * page 149, paragraph 1 * * page 215, line 54 *; | [A] - HARST ANJA ET AL, "Aha1 competes with Hop, p50 and p23 for binding to the molecular chaperone Hsp90 and contributes to kinase and hormone receptor activation.", THE BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL 1 MAY 2005, (20050501), vol. 387, no. Pt 3, ISSN 1470-8728, pages 789 - 796, XP002545499 [A] 1-12 * figure 6 * * page 790, column R, paragraph 2 * | [A] - HARBORTH J ET AL, "Sequence, chemical, and structural variation of small interfering RNAs and short hairpin RNAs and the effect on mammalian gene silencing", ANTISENSE & NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEVELOPMENT, MARY ANN LIEBERT, INC., NEW YORK, US, (20030401), vol. 13, no. 2, ISSN 1087-2906, pages 83 - 105, XP002284355 [A] 1-12 * figures 7,8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/108729003321629638 | by applicant | US513030 | US564562 | US3687808 | US4426330 | US4469863 | US4476301 | US4534899 | US4587044 | US4605735 | US4667025 | WO8804924 | US4762779 | US4789737 | WO8902468 | US4824941 | US4828979 | US4835263 | US4837028 | WO8905345 | US4845205 | WO8907136 | US4868116 | US4876335 | US4904582 | WO9004384 | US4948882 | US4958013 | US4980286 | US4981957 | WO9105545 | US5013556 | US5023243 | US5034506 | US5082830 | US5109124 | US5112963 | WO9207573 | US5118800 | US5118802 | US5134066 | US5138045 | US5139941 | US5166315 | US5175273 | US5177195 | US5185444 | US5188897 | US5214134 | US5214136 | US5213804 | US5216141 | US5218105 | US5225212 | US5235033 | US5245022 | US5252479 | US5254469 | US5258506 | US5262536 | US5264423 | US5264564 | US5264221 | WO9324641 | US5272250 | US5276019 | US5278302 | US5286717 | US5292873 | EP0445131 | US5317098 | US5319080 | US5321131 | WO9413788 | US5328470 | WO9420073 | US5356633 | US5359044 | US5367066 | US5371241 | EP0496813 | US5391723 | US5393878 | US5399676 | US5405939 | US5405938 | US5414077 | US5416203 | US5432272 | US5434257 | US5446137 | US5451463 | US5453496 | US5455233 | US5457187 | US5459255 | US5466677 | US5466786 | US5470967 | US5476925 | US5484908 | US5486603 | US5489677 | US5502177 | WO9610391 | US5510475 | US5512439 | US5512667 | US5514785 | US5519126 | US5519134 | US5525711 | US5525465 | US5536821 | US5539082 | US5541316 | US5541307 | US5541313 | US5540935 | US5543152 | US5545730 | US5550111 | US5552540 | US5552538 | US5556948 | US5561225 | US5563253 | US5565552 | US5567811 | US5567810 | US5571799 | US5574142 | US5576427 | US5578717 | US5578718 | US5580731 | US5585481 | WO9640062 | US5587361 | US5587469 | US5587371 | US5591722 | US5591584 | US5594121 | US5596086 | US5596091 | US5595726 | US5597909 | US5597696 | US5599923 | US5599928 | US5602240 | WO9704787 | US5608046 | US5610289 | US5610300 | US5614617 | US5618704 | WO9713499 | US5623070 | US5625050 | US5627053 | US5633360 | US5639873 | US5646265 | US5658873 | WO9730731 | US5663312 | US5665710 | US5670633 | US5677437 | US5677439 | US5681941 | US5688941 | US5700920 | US5705188 | US5714331 | US5719262 | WO9810796 | US5750692 | US5756353 | WO9831346 | US5858784 | WO9932619 | WO9953050 | WO9961631 | WO0022113 | WO0022114 | US6054299 | WO0027359 | US6071497 | WO0044895 | WO0066206 | WO0154664 | WO0160420 | US6294153 | US6344194 | DE10100586 | WO02053190 | WO02060412 | WO02066078 | WO03067262 | WO2004065601 | - PANARETOU, B. ET AL., MOL. CELL, (2002), vol. 10, pages 1307 - 1318 | - LOTZ, G. P. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, pages 17228 - 17235 | - MCYCR, P. ET AL., EMBO J., (2004), vol. 23, pages 511 - 519 | - PICARD, D., CELL MOL. LIFE SCI., (2002), vol. 59, pages 1640 - 1648 | - PEARL, L. H., PRODROMOU, C., ADV. PROTEIN CHEM., (2002), vol. 59, pages 157 - 185 | - PRATT, W. B., TOFT, D.O, EXP. BIOL. MED., (2003), vol. 228, pages 111 - 133 | - PRODROMOU, C., PEARL, L. H., CURR. CANCER DRUG TARGETS, (2003), vol. 3, pages 301 - 323 | - PANARETOU, B. ET AL., EMBO J., (1998), vol. 17, pages 4829 - 4836 | - PRODROMOU, C. ET AL., EMBO J., (2000), vol. 19, pages 4383 - 4392 | - WHITESELL L, DAI C., FUTURE ONCOL., (2005), vol. 1, pages 529 - 540 | - PRATT, W. B., ANNU. REV. PHARMACOL. TOXICOL, (1997), vol. 37, pages 297 - 326 | - YANG, D. ET AL., CURR. BIOL., (2000), vol. 10, pages 1191 - 1200 | - ELBASHIR ET AL., EMBO, (2001), vol. 20, pages 6877 - 6888 | - Current protocols in nucleic acid chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC. | - NIELSEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, pages 1497 - 1500 | - MARTIN ET AL., HELV. CHIM. ACTA, (1995), vol. 78, pages 486 - 504 | - The Concise Encyclopedia Of Polymer Science And Engineering, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1990), pages 858 - 859 | - ENGLISCH ET AL., ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, (1991), vol. 30, page 613 | - SANGHVI, Y S., DsRNA Research and Applications, CRC PRESS, (1993), pages 289 - 302 | - DsRNA Research and Applications, CRC PRESS, (1993), pages 276 - 278 | - LETSINGER ET AL., PROC.NATL ACID. SCI. USA, vol. 199, no. 86, pages 6553 - 6556 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., BIORG. MED. CHEM. LET., (1994), vol. 4, pages 1053 - 1060 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI, (1992), vol. 660, pages 306 - 309 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., BIORG. MED. CHEM. LET., (1993), vol. 3, pages 2765 - 2770 | - OBERHAUSER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, pages 533 - 538 | - SAISON-BEHMOARAS ET AL., EMBO J, (1991), vol. 10, pages 1111 - 1118 | - KABANOV ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1990), vol. 259, pages 327 - 330 | - SVINARCHUK ET AL., BIOCHIMIE, (1993), vol. 75, pages 49 - 54 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1995), vol. 36, pages 3651 - 3654 | - SHEA ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, pages 3777 - 3783 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, (1995), vol. 14, pages 969 - 973 | - MISHRA ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1995), vol. 1264, pages 229 - 237 | - CROOKE ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1996), vol. 277, pages 923 - 937 | - LETSINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, page 6553 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1994), vol. 4, page 1053 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1992), vol. 660, page 306 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LET., (1993), vol. 3, page 2765 | - OBERHAUSER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, page 533 | - SAISON-BEHMOARAS ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, page 111 | - KABANOV ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1990), vol. 259, page 327 | - SVINARCHUK ET AL., BIOCHIMIE, (1993), vol. 75, page 49 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1995), vol. 36, page 3651 | - SHEA ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, page 3777 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, (1995), vol. 14, page 969 | - MISHRA ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1995), vol. 1264, page 229 | - CROOKE ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1996), vol. 277, page 923 | - RABINOWITZ J E ET AL., J VIROL, (2002), vol. 76, pages 791 - 801 | - DORNBURG R, GENE THERAP., (1995), vol. 2, pages 301 - 310 | - EGLITIS M A, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 608 - 614 | - MILLER A D, HUM GENE THERAP., (1990), vol. 1, pages 5 - 14 | - ANDERSON W F, NATURE, (1998), vol. 392, pages 25 - 30 | - RUBINSON D A ET AL., NAT. GENET., vol. 33, pages 401 - 406 | - XIA H ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (2002), vol. 20, pages 1006 - 1010 | - SAMULSKI R ET AL., J. VIROL., (1987), vol. 61, pages 3096 - 3101 | - FISHER K J ET AL., J. VIROL, (1996), vol. 70, pages 520 - 532 | - SAMULSKI R ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 3822 - 3826 | - IDSON, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, Lieberman, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), vol. 1, page 199 | - ROSOFF, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), vol. 1, page 245 | - Block in Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, Lieberman, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), vol. 2, page 335 | - HIGUCHI ET AL., Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO., (1985), page 301 | - RIEGER, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), vol. 1, page 285 | - IDSON, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), vol. 1, page 199 | - BLOCK, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), vol. 1, page 335 | - ROSOFF, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, MARCEL DEKKER. INC., (1988), vol. 1, page 245 | - LEUNG, SHAH, Controlled Release of Drugs: Polymers and Aggregate Systems, VCH PUBLISHERS, (1989), pages 185 - 215 | - SCHOTT, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO., (1985), page 271 | - CONSTANTINIDES ET AL., PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 11, pages 1385 - 1390 | - RITSCHEL, METH. FIND. EXP. CLIN. PHARMACOL., (1993), vol. 13, page 205 | - CONSTANTINIDES ET AL., PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 11, page 1385 | - HO ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1996), vol. 85, pages 138 - 143 | - LEE ET AL., CRITICAL REVIEWS IN THERAPEUTIC DRUG CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1991), page 92 | - WANG ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1987), vol. 147, pages 980 - 985 | - ZHOU ET AL., JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1992), vol. 19, pages 269 - 274 | - WEINER ET AL., JOURNAL OF DRUG TARGETING, (1992), vol. 2, pages 405 - 410 | - DU PLESSIS ET AL., ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (1992), vol. 18, pages 259 - 265 | - HU ET AL., S.T.P.PHARMA. SCI., (1994), vol. 4, no. 6, page 466 | - ALLEN ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1987), vol. 223, page 42 | - WU ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 53, page 3765 | - PAPAHADJOPOULOS ET AL., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1987), vol. 507, page 64 | - GABIZON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1988), vol. 85, page 6949 | - SUNAMOTO ET AL., BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN., (1980), vol. 53, page 2778 | - KLIBANOV ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1990), vol. 268, page 235 | - BLUME ET AL., BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1990), vol. 1029, page 91 | - RIEGER, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), page 285 | - TAKAHASHI ET AL., J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1988), vol. 40, page 252 | - LEE ET AL., CRITICAL REVIEWS IN THERAPEUTIC DRUG CARRYIER SYSTEMS, (1991), page 92 | - MURANISHI, CRITICAL REVIEWS IN THERAPEUTIC DRUG CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1990), vol. 7, pages 1 - 33 | - EL HARIRI ET AL., J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1992), vol. 44, pages 651 - 654 | - BRUNTON ET AL., Goodman & Gilman's The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, MCGRAW-HILL, (1996), pages 934 - 935 | - SWINYARD, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO., (1990), pages 782 - 783 | - YAMAMOTO ET AL., J. PHARM. EXP. THER., (1992), vol. 263, page 25 | - YAMASHITA ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1990), vol. 79, pages 579 - 583 | - JARRETT, J. CHROMATOGR., (1993), vol. 618, pages 315 - 339 | - BUUR ET AL., J. CONTROL REL., (1990), vol. 14, pages 43 - 51 | - YAMASHITA ET AL., J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1987), vol. 39, pages 621 - 626 | - MIYAO ET AL., ANTISENSE RES. DEV., (1995), vol. 5, pages 115 - 121 | - TAKAL:URA, ANTISENSE &NUCL ACID DRUG DEV., (1996), vol. 6, pages 177 - 183 | - TEMPLIN ET AL., ANTISENSE NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEV, (2000), vol. 10, pages 359 - 368 | - SANDRASAGRA ET AL., EXPERT OPIN BIOL THER, (2001), vol. 1, pages 979 - 983 | - SANDRASAGRA ET AL., ANTISENSE NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEV, (2002), vol. 12, pages 177 - 181 | - WARHEIT ET AL., MICROSCOPY RES. TECH., (1993), vol. 26, pages 412 - 422 | - "Physiology and Pathophysiology of Pulmonary Macrophagcs", BRAIN, J. D., The Rcticuloendothelial System, PLENUM, (1985), pages 315 - 327 | - The Merck Manual of Diagnosis and Therapy, (1987), pages 1206 - 1228 | - The Merck Manual of Diagnosis and Therapy, (1987), pages 2499 - 2506 | - COUTURE, A ET AL., TIG, (1996), vol. 12, pages 5 - 10 | - GASSMANN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, page 1292 | - MUZYCZKA ET AL., CURR. TOPICS MICRO. LMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 158, pages 97 - 129 | - BERKNER ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1998), vol. 6, page 616 | - ROSENFELD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 252, pages 431 - 434 | - ROSENFELD ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 68, pages 143 - 155 | - EGLITIS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, pages 1395 - 1398 | - DANOS, MULLIGAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 85, pages 6460 - 6464 | - WILSON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 3014 - 3018 | - ARMENTANO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 6141 - 6145 | - HUBER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 8039 - 8043 | - FERRY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 8377 - 8381 | - CHOWDHURY ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, pages 1802 - 1805 | - VAN BEUSECHEM. ET AL., PROC. NAD. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 7640 - 7619 | - KAY ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1992), vol. 3, pages 641 - 647 | - DAI ET AL., PROC. NATL.ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10892 - 10895 | - HWU ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 150, pages 4104 - 4115 | - COMETTE ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1991), vol. 2, pages 5 - 10 | - CONE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, page 6349 | - HSU ET AL., J. INFECTIOUS DISEASE, (1992), vol. 166, page 769 | - BUCCHINI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 2511 - 2515 | - DOCHERTY ET AL., FASEB J., (1994), vol. 8, pages 20 - 24 | - CHEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 3054 - 3057 | US19970886829 | US19980082624 | US19980108673 | US19990256515 | US19990315298 |