EP2420749 - Climate control for a building [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/08] | Climatisation for application in a suspended ceiling of a space in a building | ||
[2017/22] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2020 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERALU, naamloze vennootschap Fotografielaan 49-51 2610 Wilrijk / BE | [2020/35] |
Former [2017/26] | For all designated states INTERALU, naamloze vennootschap Fotografielaan 49-51 2610 Wilrijk / BE | ||
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states INTERALU, naanloze vennootschap Fotografielaan 49-51 2610 Wilrijk / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schrauwen, Anthony Alfons Servaislei 86 2900 Schoten / BE | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2020/35] |
Former [2017/26] | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [2012/08] | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 11006777.4 | 19.08.2011 | [2012/08] | Priority number, date | BE20100000497 | 20.08.2010 Original published format: BE 201000497 | [2012/08] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2420749 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2420749 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2420749 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2420749 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F24F5/00, F24D3/16 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
F24F5/0089 (EP);
F24D3/165 (EP);
F24F5/0092 (EP);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] |
Former [2012/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Klimatisierung für Anwendung in einer Zwischendecke eines Raums in einem Gebäude | [2019/47] | English: | Climate control for a building | [2017/22] | French: | Climatisation pour application dans un plafond suspendu d'espace d'un bâtiment | [2019/47] |
Former [2012/08] | Klimatisierung für Anwendung in einer Zwischendecke eines Raums in einem Gebäude | ||
Former [2012/08] | Climatisation for application in a suspended ceiling of a space in a building | ||
Former [2012/08] | Climatisation pour application dans un plafond suspendu d'espace d'un bâtiment | Examination procedure | 12.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 09.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.03.2018
12.09.2019
WITHDRAWN In-Nergy s.p.r.l. Avenue Reine Astrid 69 4900 Spa / BE Opponent's representative Quintelier, Claude Koala s.p.r.l. Avenue de Calabre 53/9 1200 Bruxelles / BE | [2019/43] |
Former [2018/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.03.2018
WITHDRAWN In-Nergy s.p.r.l. Avenue Reine Astrid 69 4900 Spa / BE Opponent's representative Quintelier, Claude Koala s.p.r.l. Avenue de Calabre 53/9 1200 Bruxelles / BE | 12.04.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.08.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.10.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.11.2019 | 12.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.12.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 15.07.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2011 | AL | 28.06.2017 | AT | 28.06.2017 | CY | 28.06.2017 | CZ | 28.06.2017 | EE | 28.06.2017 | HR | 28.06.2017 | LT | 28.06.2017 | LV | 28.06.2017 | MK | 28.06.2017 | RS | 28.06.2017 | SI | 28.06.2017 | SK | 28.06.2017 | SM | 28.06.2017 | MT | 19.08.2017 | BG | 28.09.2017 | GR | 29.09.2017 | IS | 28.10.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 19.08.2011 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 19.08.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.08.2011 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 19.08.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.08.2011 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 19.08.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 19.08.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | HR | 28.06.2017 | |
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | HR | 28.06.2017 | |
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE9401030U (TROX GMBH GEB [DE]) [X] 1,3,6,9 * page 4 - page 6; claims 1-4 * [I] 2,4,5,7,8,10-15; | [A]GB2262548 (HUNTER DOUGLAS IND BV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 36; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0733865 (GIACOMINI SERVICES AND ENGINEE [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4318833 (ZENT FRENGER STRAHLUNGSHEIZUNG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE202006002111U (THERMOSOFT KLIMATECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | Opposition | EP0548480 | EP0651107 | DE9216792U | EP0897040 | EP0548480 | - "Verslag van proeven Nr. 6216", Laboratorium voor Aanwending der brandstoffen en warmte-overdracht, (19890000), XP055479155 |