EP2559942 - Gas turbine combustion chamber head with cooling and damping [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE | [2013/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerendás, Miklós Bahnhofsallee 4 15838 Am Mellensee / DE | 02 /
Sadig, Sermed Filandastrasse 31 12169 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Becker, Jochen Fontaneweg 11c 15834 Rangsdorf / DE | 04 /
Carrotte, Jonathan F. 9 Barry Drive Kirby Muxloe, Leicester LE9 2HG / GB | 05 /
Rupp, Jochen 306 Tutbury Road Burton-on-Trent, Staffordshire DE13 0AJ / GB | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [2013/08] | Application number, filing date | 11006812.9 | 19.08.2011 | [2013/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2559942 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F23M99/00, F23R3/10 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
F23R3/10 (EP,US);
F23M20/005 (EP,US);
F23R2900/00014 (EP,US);
F23R2900/00017 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03042 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03043 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03045 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Brennkammerkopf einer Gasturbine mit Kühlung und Dämpfung | [2013/08] | English: | Gas turbine combustion chamber head with cooling and damping | [2013/08] | French: | Tête de chambre de combustion d'une turbine à gaz dotée d'un refroidissement et d'un amortissement | [2013/08] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 10.06.2013 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 18.06.2013 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 12.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/12] | 27.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]EP2273196 (ROLLS ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [XD] 13-15 * paragraphs [0016] , [ 0019] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1-5; claim 11 * [Y] 8,9 [I] 1-7,10-12,16; | [Y]EP1865259 (ROLLS ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [Y] 8,9 * paragraphs [0009] , [ 0013] , [ 0014] , [ 0034]; figures 5, 6 *; | [I]US4686823 (COBURN ROBERT E [US], et al) [I] 1-4 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 52; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0724119 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,3,4,10,12 * page 1, line 1 - line 7 * * column 3, line 53 - line 58 * * column 5, line 35 - line 50; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP1666795 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 13-16 * paragraphs [0008] , [ 0051] , [ 0052] , [ 0053]; figure 4 * | by applicant | DE4427222 | WO9216798 | EP0971172 | EP0576717 | CA2627627 | US2007169992 | DE102009032277 | - "The absorption of axial acoustic waves by a perforated liner with bias flow", J. Fluid Mech., CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, (2003), vol. 485, pages 307 - 335 |