EP2421199 - Method for transforming a workflow into a management object tree [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HTC Corporation No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan District Taoyuan City 330 / TW | [2015/13] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states HTC Corporation No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City Taoyuan County 330 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yu, Chun-Ta Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | 02 /
Tseng, Yin-Yeh Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Ljungberg, Robert, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow Strathclyde G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Ljungberg, Robert, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11006865.7 | 22.08.2011 | [2012/08] | Priority number, date | US20100375862P | 22.08.2010 Original published format: US 375862 P | [2012/50] |
Former [2012/08] | US20100375862 | 22.08.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2421199 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, G06Q10/00, H04W99/00, H04L29/08 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
H04L41/0233 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06Q10/00 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
H04L41/0813 (EP,US);
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Umwandeln eines Arbeitsablaufs in einen Management-Objektbaum | [2012/08] | English: | Method for transforming a workflow into a management object tree | [2012/08] | French: | Procédé de transformation de flux de travail dans une arborescence d'objets de gestion | [2012/08] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 28.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/37] | 04.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005289526 (WANG JIAN [CN], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0053] * * paragraphs [0069] - [0070] *; | [A]WO2009021208 (INNOPATH SOFTWARE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 30 * * page 10, line 1 - page 12, line 29 * * page 14, line 15 - page 25, line 18 * * page 28, line 3 - page 31, line 24 * | [Y] - "Software and Application Control Management Object Requirements, Candidate Version 1.0", OMA-RD-SACMO-V1_0-20100727-C, (20100727), pages 1 - 15, XP055009828 [Y] 1-12 * Section 4 Section 5.1 Section 6.1 Section 6.2.1 Section 6.2.2 Appendix B * | [A] - "SACMO Specification, Draft Version 1.0", OMA-TS-SACMO-V1_0-20100727-D, (20100727), pages 1 - 27, XP055009835 [A] 1-12 * pages 7-19 * |