EP2397102 - Drill guide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Straumann Holding AG Peter Merian-Weg 12 4002 Basel / CH | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suter, Edmund c/o Institut Straumann AG Peter Merian- Weg 12 4002 Basel / CH | 02 /
Streff, Patrick c/o Institut Straumann AG Peter Merian- Weg 12 4002 Basel / CH | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Cornelia Schaad Balass Menzl & Partner AG Patentanwälte Dufourstrasse 101 CH-8034 Zürich / CH | [2011/51] | Application number, filing date | 11006938.2 | 22.08.2007 | [2011/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2397102 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61C1/08, A61C8/00 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
A61C1/084 (EP,US);
A61C8/0089 (EP,US);
A61C3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/51] | Title | German: | Bohrerführung | [2011/51] | English: | Drill guide | [2011/51] | French: | Glissière de foret | [2011/51] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 10.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/34] | 01.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07016398.5 / EP2027828 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070016398) is 28.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9400073 (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * figures 1,2,5,8-12 *; | [A]US5888034 (GREENBERG ALEX M [US]) [A] 1-16 * figures 4a,21a * * column 17, line 58 - column 18, line 13 *; | [A]US2006240378 (WEINSTEIN URIEL [IL], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 4b,11 * | by applicant | WO2006130067 | WO2006014130 | WO9749351 |