EP2400008 - In tumours differentially expressed gene products and use of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ganymed Pharmaceuticals GmbH An der Goldgrube 12 55131 Mainz / DE | [2018/42] |
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states Ganymed Pharmaceuticals AG An der Goldgrube 12 55131 Mainz / DE | ||
Former [2011/52] | For all designated states Ganymed Pharmaceuticals AG Freiligrathstrasse 12 55131 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sahin, Ugur Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1 55116 Mainz / DE | 02 /
Türeci, Özlem Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1 55116 Mainz / DE | 03 /
Koslowski, Michael Am Ried 23 85764 Oberschleißheim / DE | [2012/51] |
Former [2011/52] | 01 /
Sahin, Ugur Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1 55116 Mainz / DE | ||
02 /
Türeci, Özlem Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1 55116 Mainz / DE | |||
03 /
Koslowski, Michael Autogenstrasse 50 65933 Frankfurt / DE | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Schnappauf, Georg, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11007319.4 | 21.11.2003 | [2011/52] | Priority number, date | DE20021054601 | 22.11.2002 Original published format: DE 10254601 | [2011/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2400008 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2400008 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, A61K39/395, C12N5/10, C07K14/47, C07K16/30, C07K16/32, A61K48/00, C07K16/18, G01N33/574 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K39/39558 (KR);
A61K48/005 (CN);
C07K16/3076 (US);
A61K39/0011 (CN);
A61K39/395 (CN);
A61K47/549 (US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K16/30 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/3023 (EP,US);
C07K16/3046 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (CN);
G01N33/5011 (CN);
G01N33/5017 (CN);
G01N33/57407 (CN);
G01N33/57484 (EP,CN,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/30 (KR,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2503/02 (CN);
C12Q2600/136 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2011/52] | C12N15/11, A61K39/395, C12N5/10, C07K14/47, C07K16/30, C07K16/32, A61K48/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/52] | Extension states | AL | 24.01.2013 | LT | 24.01.2013 | LV | 24.01.2013 | MK | 24.01.2013 | Title | German: | Differentiell in Tumoren exprimierte Genprodukte und deren Verwendung | [2011/52] | English: | In tumours differentially expressed gene products and use of the same | [2011/52] | French: | Produits géniques d'expression différentielle dans les tumeurs et leur utilisation | [2011/52] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 02.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/44] | 06.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03773719.4 / EP1563068 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030773719) is 08.09.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.01.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 17.01.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.03.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 10.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.03.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0127257 (UNIV ARKANSAS [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO0154708 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9,14-16 * page 8, line 8 ff; sequence 123 * [I] 1-16; | [A]WO0162920 (CORIXA CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO0168848 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9,13-16 * the whole document * [I] 1-16; | [XI]WO0218576 (DIADEXUS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9,13-16 * claims 1-16; sequence 76 * * claim 2 * [I] 1-16; | [A]WO0222684 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]WO0246224 (DIADEXUS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2002119130 (EATON DAN L [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12-16 * example 18; sequences 117, 118 * [I] 1-16; | [A]WO02074237 (CORIXA CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XI] - NIIMI T ET AL, "claudin-18, a novel downstream target gene for the T/EBP/NKX2.1 homeodomain transcription factor, encodes lung- and stomach-specific isoforms through alternative splicing.", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY NOV 2001, (200111), vol. 21, no. 21, ISSN 0270-7306, pages 7380 - 7390, XP002433561 [X] 1,6,9,15 * the whole document * [I] 1-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.21.21.7380-7390.2001 | [A] - REITER Y ET AL, "peptide-specific killing of antigen-presenting cells by a recombinant antibody-toxin fusion protein targeted to major histocompatibility complex/peptide class I complexes with T cell receptor-like specificity", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (199704), vol. 94, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 4631 - 4636, XP002967291 [A] 1-16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.9.4631 | [A] - ENGBERG J ET AL, "RECOMBINANT ANTIBODIES WITH THE ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC, MHC RESTRICTED SPECIFICITY OF T CELLS: NOVEL REAGENTS FOR BASIC AND CLINICAL INVESTIGATIONS AND IMMUNOTHERAPY", IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY, XX, XX, (199903), vol. 4, pages 273 - 278, XP000991083 [A] 1-16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1380-2933(98)00017-7 | [A] - RUDOLPH M G ET AL, "The specificity of TCR/pMHC interaction", CURRENT OPINION IN IMMUNOLOGY, CURRENT BIOLOGY LTD, (20020201), vol. 14, no. 1, ISSN 0952-7915, pages 52 - 65, XP004332735 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0952-7915(01)00298-9 | by applicant | WO9204381 | WO9633265 | WO9633739 | - PARDOLL, NAT. MED, (1998), vol. 4, page 525.31 | - VAN DER BRUGGEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, pages 1643 - 1647 | - SAHIN ET AL., CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 9, pages 709 - 716 | - SCHMITT ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1999), vol. 27, pages 4251 - 4260 | - VASMATZIS ET AL., PROC. NATL. AEAD. SEI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 300 - 304 | - SCHEURLE ET AL., CANCER RES., (2000), vol. 60, pages 4037 - 4043 | - DURAND, SETA, CLIN. CHEM., (2000), vol. 46, pages 795 - 805 | - HAKOMORI, CANCER RES., (1996), vol. 56, pages 5309 - 5318 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC. | - ANDERSON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 143, pages 1899 - 1904 | - GARDSVOLL, J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2000), vol. 234, pages 107 - 116 | - KAYYEM ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1992), vol. 208, pages 1 - 8 | - SPILLER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1999), vol. 224, pages 51 - 60 | - PHILIP SHEPHERD, CHRISTOPHER DEAN, MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES: A PRACTICAL APPROACH | - Antibodies: A Laboratory Manual | - EDWARD HARLOW, DAVID LANE, Using Antibodies: A Laboratory Manual: Portable Protocol NO | - AZORSA ET AL., J IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1999), vol. 229, pages 35 - 48 | - ANDERSON ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 143, pages 1899 - 1904 | - GARDSVOLL, J IMMUNOL. METHODS., (2000), vol. 234, pages 107 - 116 | - ED HARLOW, DAVID LANE, Antibodies: A Laboratory Manual | - DE WILDT ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1997), vol. 207, pages 61 - 67 | - ALTMAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 274, pages 94 - 96 | - DUNBAR ET AL., CURR. BIOL., (1998), vol. 8, pages 413 - 416 | - GREENBERG, J. IMMUNOL., (1986), vol. 136, no. 5, page 1917 | - RIDDEL ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 257, page 238 | - LYNCH ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 21, pages 1403 - 1410 | - KAST ET AL., CELL, (1989), vol. 59, pages 603 - 614 | - STANISLAWSKI ET AL., NAT IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 2, pages 962 - 970 | - KESSELS ET AL., NAT IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 2, pages 957 - 961 | - OSSENDORP ET AL., IMMUNOL LETT., (2000), vol. 74, pages 75 - 79 | - OSSENDORP ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1998), vol. 187, pages 693 - 702 | - MALOY ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 3299 - 3303 | - KEOGH ET AL., JLMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 167, pages 787 - 796 | - APPELLA ET AL., BIOMED PEPT PROTEINS NUCLEIC ACIDS, (1995), vol. 1, pages 177 - 184 | - WENTWORTH ET AL., MOL IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 32, pages 603 - 612 | - SO ET AL., MOL. CELLS, (1997), vol. 7, pages 178 - 186 | - KREIG ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 374, pages 546 - 549 | - SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 268, pages 1432 - 1434 | - ZHENG, P. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, no. 11, pages 6284 - 6289 | - GAJEWSKI ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, pages 5637 - 5648 | - RIDGE ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 393, page 474 | - BENNETT ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 393, page 478 | - SCHÖNBERGER ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 393, page 480 | - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS | - WHEELER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 28, pages 10 - 14 | - ADAMS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 252, page 1651 | - HILLIER ET AL., GENOME RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 6, pages 807 - 828 | - PENNISI, SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 276, pages 1023 - 1024 | - CHOMCZYNSKI, SACCHI, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 162, pages 156 - 159 | - LEMOINE ET AL., METHODS MOL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 75, pages 441 - 447 | - SHI ET AL., J. HISTOCHEM. CYTOCHEM., (1991), vol. 39, pages 741 - 748 | - SHIN ET AL., LAB. INVEST., (1991), vol. 64, pages 693 - 702 | - EDWARD HARLOW, DAVID LANE, Using Antibodies : A Laboratory Manual : Portable Protocol NO. | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD., WILEY INTERSCIENCE | - JUNG ET AL., MOL CELLS, (2001), vol. 12, pages 41 - 49 | - KASINRERK ET AL., HYBRID HYBRIDOMICS, (2002), vol. 21, pages 287 - 293 | - Current Protocols in Proteinchemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD., WILEY INTERSCIENCE | - LEMOINE ET AL., METHODS MOL. BIOL, (1997), vol. 75, pages 441 - 447 | - O'DOWD ET AL., GENOMICS, (1998), vol. 47, pages 310 - 313 | - HORIKAWA Y, ODA N, COX NJ, LI X, ORHO-MELANDER M, HARA M, HINOKIO Y, LINDNER TH, MASHIMA H, SCHWARZ PE, NAT GENET., (200010), vol. 26, no. 2, pages 163 - 175 | - PARK ET AL., CANCER EPIDEMIOL BIOMARKERS PREV., (2002), vol. 11, pages 739 - 744 | - PEARLMAN ET AL., DIG. DIS. SCI., (2000), vol. 45, pages 298 - 305 | - TREMBLAY ET AL., MOL CELL BIOCHEM, vol. 230, page 31 | - NIIMI ET AL., AM J HUM GENET, (2002), vol. 70, pages 718 - 725 | - NIIMI, KOLLEGEN, MOL. CELL. BIOL., (2001), vol. 21, pages 7380 - 7390 | - RADER C, RITTER G, NATHAN S, ELIA M, GOUT I, JUNGBLUTH AA, COHEN LS, WELT S, OLD LJ, BARBAS CF 3RD, "The rabbit antibody repertoire as a novel source for the generation of therapeutic human antibodies", J BIOL CHEM., (20000505), vol. 275, no. 18, pages 13668 - 13676 | - LEE ET AL., GENOMICS, vol. 70, pages 354 - 363 | - GRUBER ET AL., GENOMICS, (1998), vol. 54, pages 200 - 214 | - BINGLE, BINGLE, BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (2000), vol. 1493, pages 363 - 367 | - LOHI ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2002), vol. 277, pages 14246 - 14254 |