EP2567792 - Dispensing cabinet and method for controlled dispensing of objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Stoffel, Kai Konstantin Trientlgasse 45 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2013/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stoffel, Kai, Konstantin, Dr. Trientlgasse 45 6020 Innsbruck / AT | 02 /
Isser, Armin c/o Rathgeber GmbH Trientlgasse 45 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2013/11] | Representative(s) | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte PartG mbB Irmgardstraße 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/07] | Wunderlich, Rainer, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/11] | Wunderlich, Rainer, et al Patentanwälte Weber & Heim Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11007353.3 | 09.09.2011 | [2013/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2567792 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2567792 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B25H3/00, G07F11/54 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
G07F11/00 (EP,US);
B25H3/00 (EP,US);
G07F11/48 (EP,US);
G07F11/54 (EP,US);
G07F11/56 (US);
G07F17/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] |
Former [2013/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Ausgabeschrank und Verfahren zum kontrollierten Ausgeben von Gegenständen | [2013/11] | English: | Dispensing cabinet and method for controlled dispensing of objects | [2013/11] | French: | Armoire de distribution et procédé de distribution contrôlée d'objets | [2013/11] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 04.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.02.2018 | CY | 14.02.2018 | CZ | 14.02.2018 | DK | 14.02.2018 | EE | 14.02.2018 | FI | 14.02.2018 | HR | 14.02.2018 | LT | 14.02.2018 | LV | 14.02.2018 | MC | 14.02.2018 | MK | 14.02.2018 | MT | 14.02.2018 | NL | 14.02.2018 | PT | 14.02.2018 | RO | 14.02.2018 | RS | 14.02.2018 | SE | 14.02.2018 | SI | 14.02.2018 | SK | 14.02.2018 | SM | 14.02.2018 | TR | 14.02.2018 | BG | 14.05.2018 | NO | 14.05.2018 | GR | 15.05.2018 | IS | 14.06.2018 | IE | 09.09.2018 | LU | 09.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MK | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
IE | 09.09.2018 | ||
LU | 09.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
IE | 09.09.2018 | ||
LU | 09.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
IE | 09.09.2018 | ||
LU | 09.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
IE | 09.09.2018 | ||
LU | 09.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
IE | 09.09.2018 | ||
LU | 09.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
IE | 09.09.2018 | ||
LU | 09.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
LU | 09.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2113890 (RIELLO CUSTOMADE ROBOTIC DISPE [IT]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,10,12 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0025] - [0039]; figure - * [I] 5,8,11; | [XI]WO0217249 (CRANE CO [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8,10,12 * pages 4-6,9; figure - * [I] 5,7; | [XI]US2010017023 (JACOMET ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,10-12 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0036] - [0050]; figure - * [I] 5,6,9; | [X]EP0710936 (JAC KOOIJ & ZN [NL]) [X] 1-4,6,8,10,12 * column 2; figure - *; | [Y]US5205436 (SAVAGE KENT V [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,8,10-12 * columns 2,5-10; figure - *; | [Y]GB2453977 (ZEROSHIFT LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,10-12 * pages 1-7; figure - *; | [YD]DE202009016806U (BAMBERGER LOTHAR [DE]) [YD] 1,2,4,8,10,12 * paragraphs [0022] - [0028]; figure - *; | [A]US2004104652 (HOLMES WILLIAM K [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * pages 1,2; figure - *; | [A]US2008309583 (HSIEH CHIH-CHING [TW]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005]; figure - *; | [A]US5172829 (DELLICKER JR HENRY A [US]) [A] 1-12 * columns 2,3; figure - *; | [A]EP1264666 (NICMA S R L [IT]) [A] 1-12 * columns 3,4; figure - * | by applicant | DE102007027012 | DE202009016806U | DE29803081U |