EP2439813 - Decoy for protecting objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall Waffe Munition GmbH Heinrich-Ehrhardt-Strasse 2 29345 Unterlüss / DE | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmitz, Jürgen, Dr. Heinrich-Müller-Straße 14 38518 Gifhorn / DE | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 11007389.7 | 10.09.2011 | [2012/15] | Priority number, date | DE20101047860 | 07.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010047860 | [2012/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2439813 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2439813 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/28, H01Q15/14, H01Q1/34, H01Q17/00, F41H3/00, F41J2/00, F42B5/15, F42B12/70 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
H01Q15/145 (EP);
F41H3/00 (EP);
F41J2/00 (EP);
F42B12/70 (EP);
F42B5/15 (EP);
H01Q17/00 (EP);
H01Q17/008 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Title | German: | Täuschkörper zum Schutz von Objekten | [2012/15] | English: | Decoy for protecting objects | [2012/15] | French: | Corps d'illusion pour la protection d'objets | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 24.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2011 | AL | 06.11.2013 | BG | 06.11.2013 | CY | 06.11.2013 | CZ | 06.11.2013 | DK | 06.11.2013 | EE | 06.11.2013 | ES | 06.11.2013 | FI | 06.11.2013 | HR | 06.11.2013 | IT | 06.11.2013 | LT | 06.11.2013 | LV | 06.11.2013 | MC | 06.11.2013 | MK | 06.11.2013 | MT | 06.11.2013 | NL | 06.11.2013 | PL | 06.11.2013 | RO | 06.11.2013 | RS | 06.11.2013 | SE | 06.11.2013 | SI | 06.11.2013 | SK | 06.11.2013 | SM | 06.11.2013 | TR | 06.11.2013 | NO | 06.02.2014 | GR | 07.02.2014 | IS | 06.03.2014 | PT | 06.03.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 10.09.2011 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MK | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 10.09.2011 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 10.09.2011 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 06.11.2013 | |
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 06.11.2013 | |
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | ES | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | ES | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 06.11.2013 | |
NO | 06.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2459526 (POURDES ET EXPLOSIFS SOC NAT D [FR]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US4406227 (BEEKER CHARLES W [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * figures 1,5,6 *; | [A]GB2433841 (PLESSEY CO PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 4 - page 5; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0520677 (GRACE NV [BE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | by applicant | US6876320 | US2008198060 | US2511353 | US5388783 | US6628239 | US2009189799 | US3496570 | US3731313 | US3938151 | US3258771 | US3896438 | US3958241 | US4126862 | US4646098 | US4606848 | US3662387 | US5202535 | DE19604745 |