EP2392725 - Washer dryer with reversible operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states V-Zug AG Industriestrasse 66 CH-6301 Zug / CH | [2011/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gisler, Jürg Mätteliguestraße 17 6105 Schachen / CH | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | Toleti, Martin E. Blum & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Hofwiesenstrasse 349 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Toleti, Martin c/o E.Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 11007393.9 | 12.09.2011 | [2011/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2392725 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2392725 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/28, D06F58/20 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
D06F58/44 (EP,US);
D06F2103/32 (EP,US);
D06F2103/34 (EP,US);
D06F2103/36 (EP,US);
D06F2103/38 (EP,US);
D06F2103/44 (EP,US);
D06F2103/50 (EP,US);
D06F2105/24 (EP,US);
D06F2105/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wäschetrockner mit Reversierbetrieb | [2011/49] | English: | Washer dryer with reversible operation | [2011/49] | French: | Sèche-linge doté d'un fonctionnement de renversement | [2011/49] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/17] | 03.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CH659841 (V ZUG AG) [X] 1,4,8,9,11,14,15 * page 3, column 1, line 21 - page 3, column 2, line l * [I] 2,3; | [X]EP0328250 (CREDA LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,8-10,15 * the whole document *; | [XYI]DE3820815 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,9,11,15 * the whole document * [Y] 5,6,12,13 [I] 10; | [XI]DE4032079 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,9,15 * the whole document * [I] 10; | [Y]DE4216106 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5,6,12,13 * the whole document *; | [X]US5555645 (JOSLIN DAN F [US]) [X] 1-4,8-10,15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102008007971 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-8,12-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102009055206 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-8,12-15* the whole document * |