EP2570868 - Part for a clockwork, clockwork and timepiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patek Philippe SA Genève rue du Rhône 41 1204 Genève / CH | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krüttli, Anthony 11, rue du Docteur Henriet 25390 Orchamps-Vennes / FR | 02 /
Maier, Frédéric Faubourg de l'Hôpital 33 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Micheli & Cie SA Rue de Genève 122 Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thônex / CH | [2014/36] |
Former [2013/12] | Micheli & Cie SA Rue de Genève 122 Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thônex / CH | Application number, filing date | 11007420.0 | 13.09.2011 | [2013/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2570868 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2570868 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G04B15/08, G04B17/06, G04B17/32 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
G04B15/08 (EP);
G04B17/06 (EP);
G04B17/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Title | German: | Element für Uhrwerk, Uhrwerk und Uhr | [2013/12] | English: | Part for a clockwork, clockwork and timepiece | [2013/12] | French: | Pièce pour mouvement d'horlogerie, mouvement d'horlogerie et pièce d'horlogerie | [2013/12] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 28.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.09.2011 | AL | 03.09.2014 | AT | 03.09.2014 | BG | 03.09.2014 | CY | 03.09.2014 | CZ | 03.09.2014 | DK | 03.09.2014 | EE | 03.09.2014 | ES | 03.09.2014 | FI | 03.09.2014 | HR | 03.09.2014 | IT | 03.09.2014 | LT | 03.09.2014 | LV | 03.09.2014 | MC | 03.09.2014 | MK | 03.09.2014 | MT | 03.09.2014 | NL | 03.09.2014 | PL | 03.09.2014 | RO | 03.09.2014 | RS | 03.09.2014 | SE | 03.09.2014 | SI | 03.09.2014 | SK | 03.09.2014 | SM | 03.09.2014 | TR | 03.09.2014 | IE | 13.09.2014 | LU | 13.09.2014 | BE | 30.09.2014 | NO | 03.12.2014 | GR | 04.12.2014 | IS | 03.01.2015 | PT | 05.01.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 13.09.2011 | |
AT | 03.09.2014 | ||
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MK | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
TR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 13.09.2014 | ||
LU | 13.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 13.09.2011 | |
AT | 03.09.2014 | ||
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
TR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 13.09.2014 | ||
LU | 13.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 13.09.2011 | |
AT | 03.09.2014 | ||
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 13.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 13.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 13.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 13.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 13.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 13.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 03.09.2014 | |
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 03.09.2014 | |
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 03.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1431844 (SFT SERVICES SA [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2262823 (DIEHL [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]FR583885 (TAVANNES WATCH CO SA) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2322996 | CH698876 | CH700805 |