EP2432254 - Hearing instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phonak AG Laubisrütistrasse 28 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Dombrowski, Sven Konradstrasse 3 5430 Wettingen / CH | 02 /
Leysieffer, Hans In der Au 48 8706 Meilen / CH | 03 /
Gabathuler, Bruno Huebbrunnenstrasse 2 8627 Grüningen / CH | [2012/18] |
Former [2012/12] | 01 /
von Dombrowski, Sven Konradstrasse 3 5430 Wettingen / CH | ||
02 /
Leysieffer, Hans In der Au 48 8706 Meilen / CH | |||
03 /
Gabathuler, Bruno Weidstrasse 1 8712 Stäfa / CH | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 11007689.0 | 14.01.2005 | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2432254 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2432254 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2432254 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/02, H04R25/00 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
H04R25/505 (EP);
H04R2430/03 (EP);
H04R2460/03 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/13] | H04R25/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, LI [2012/12] | Title | German: | Hörgerät | [2012/12] | English: | Hearing instrument | [2012/12] | French: | Instrument auditif | [2012/12] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 08.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05405022.4 / EP1681904 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050405022) is 24.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2303194 (MICRO TECHNIC HUEBER & CO) [X] 1,8 * page 1, line 9 - page 6, line 10; figures 1,2; claims 1-3 * [Y] 1-5,8-13; | [Y]US2002164041 (ZUREK PATRICK M [US]) [Y] 1-5,8-13 * paragraphs [0008] - [0012]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0455203 (KNOWLES ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 3, line 21 - column 5, line 50; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | DE19634984 | US6349285 | US2003013358 | US6533062 |