EP2447639 - Refrigerator comprising vacuum space [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/49] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jung, Wonyeong LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongnam 641-711 / KR | 02 /
Lee, Myungryul LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongnam 641-711 / KR | 03 /
Jhee, Sung LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongnam 641-711 / KR | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2019/13] |
Former [2012/18] | Urner, Peter TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11008032.2 | 04.10.2011 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | KR20100105894 | 28.10.2010 Original published format: KR 20100105894 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2447639 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2447639 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2447639 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/08, F25D23/06 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
F25D23/066 (EP,CN,US);
F25D23/065 (US);
F25D23/085 (EP,CN,US);
F25D2201/14 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] |
Former [2012/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kühlschrank, der einen Vakuumraum umfasst | [2012/18] | English: | Refrigerator comprising vacuum space | [2012/18] | French: | Réfrigérateur comportant un espace vide | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 28.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.10.2011 | AL | 27.03.2019 | AT | 27.03.2019 | CY | 27.03.2019 | CZ | 27.03.2019 | DK | 27.03.2019 | EE | 27.03.2019 | FI | 27.03.2019 | HR | 27.03.2019 | LT | 27.03.2019 | LV | 27.03.2019 | MC | 27.03.2019 | MK | 27.03.2019 | MT | 27.03.2019 | PL | 27.03.2019 | RO | 27.03.2019 | RS | 27.03.2019 | SE | 27.03.2019 | SI | 27.03.2019 | SK | 27.03.2019 | SM | 27.03.2019 | TR | 27.03.2019 | BG | 27.06.2019 | NO | 27.06.2019 | GR | 28.06.2019 | IS | 27.07.2019 | PT | 27.07.2019 | IE | 04.10.2019 | LU | 04.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 04.10.2011 | |
AL | 27.03.2019 | ||
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
IE | 04.10.2019 | ||
LU | 04.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 04.10.2011 | |
AL | 27.03.2019 | ||
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
IE | 04.10.2019 | ||
LU | 04.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
IE | 04.10.2019 | ||
LU | 04.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
IE | 04.10.2019 | ||
LU | 04.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
LU | 04.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
LU | 04.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US1845353 (SNELL VIRGIL K) [X] 1-7,14,15 * figures 1-5 * [I] 8; | [A]US2989156 (BROOKS FRANK P, et al) [A] 1* figures 1,2 *; | [XI]DE19745825 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-4,9,10 * figures 1,2 * [I] 11-13; | [X]DE19745859 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1-5 *; | [X]DE19745861 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE29912917U (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE19907182 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-5 * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US6393798 (HIRATH JUERGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | KR20100105894 |