24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
21.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
17.06.2016 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
29.04.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
01.03.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
01.03.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected |
|
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
20.08.2015 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
17.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
02.12.2014 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
11.07.2014 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
13.06.2014 |
Opposition filed |
published on 16.07.2014 [2014/29] |
06.06.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
28.03.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
14.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
10.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
09.08.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
02.08.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.08.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.04.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.04.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
08.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.10.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.02.2012 |
Publication of search report |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
24.02.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
08.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |
30.12.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |