EP2458946 - Communication system for controlling electrical loads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB AG Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | For all designated states ABB AG Kallstadter Str. 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldyn, Dirk Himmelohstr. 23d 58454 Witten / DE | 02 /
Czimmeck, Frank Breitenloher Str. 28 58511 Lüdenscheid / DE | 03 /
Rümenapf, Peter Wahne Uhle 23 44149 Dortmund / DE | 04 /
Linde, Holger Friedrichstr. 17 44137 Dortmund / DE | 05 /
Madonna, Gian-Luigi Hinterdorfstr. 17 8112 Otelfingen / CH | 06 /
Cimino, Mikael Kleine Kirchgasse 6 5507 Mellingen / CH | 07 /
Ruschival, Thomas U5 24 68161 Mannheim / DE | 08 /
Bloch, Richard Mühlemoosweg 6A 6414 Oberarth / CH | 09 /
Ecklebe, Andreas Hofackerstr. 25 8953 Dietikon / CH | [2012/22] | Application number, filing date | 11008399.5 | 19.10.2011 | [2012/22] | Priority number, date | DE20101052661 | 26.11.2010 Original published format: DE102010052661 | [2012/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2458946 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2458946 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, H02M5/27, H04B3/54, H04L12/10 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
H04L12/10 (EP);
H02J13/00009 (EP);
H04B3/546 (EP);
H05B47/185 (EP);
H04B2203/5425 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem zur Steuerung von elektrischen Lasten | [2012/22] | English: | Communication system for controlling electrical loads | [2012/22] | French: | Système de communication pour la commande de charges électriques | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 14.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2011 | AL | 19.12.2012 | CY | 19.12.2012 | DK | 19.12.2012 | EE | 19.12.2012 | HR | 19.12.2012 | IT | 19.12.2012 | LT | 19.12.2012 | LV | 19.12.2012 | MC | 19.12.2012 | MK | 19.12.2012 | MT | 19.12.2012 | PL | 19.12.2012 | RO | 19.12.2012 | RS | 19.12.2012 | SE | 19.12.2012 | SI | 19.12.2012 | SK | 19.12.2012 | SM | 19.12.2012 | TR | 19.12.2012 | BG | 19.03.2013 | NO | 19.03.2013 | GR | 20.03.2013 | IS | 19.04.2013 | PT | 19.04.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
MK | 19.12.2012 | ||
MT | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
RS | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
SM | 19.12.2012 | ||
TR | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
MK | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
RS | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
SM | 19.12.2012 | ||
TR | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 19.12.2012 | |
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
MK | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
RS | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
SM | 19.12.2012 | ||
TR | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CY | 19.12.2012 | |
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
RS | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
SM | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 19.12.2012 | |
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
RS | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 19.12.2012 | |
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
RS | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 19.12.2012 | |
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
RS | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | DK | 19.12.2012 | |
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
RS | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 19.12.2012 | |
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
RS | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | EE | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
RS | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | EE | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
RS | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | EE | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RS | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | EE | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
RS | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 19.12.2012 | |
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
RS | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/32] | LT | 19.12.2012 | |
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
RS | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | LT | 19.12.2012 | |
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | LT | 19.12.2012 | |
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | LT | 19.12.2012 | |
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 19.12.2012 | |
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 19.12.2012 | |
NO | 19.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1659834 (INSTA ELEKTRO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0901313 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9608096 (LAINE SEPPO [FI]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * |