Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP2446995


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.11.2013 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  25.12.2013  [2013/52]
11.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.02.2013 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
31.10.2012 Amendment by applicant
01.05.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.05.2012  [2012/18]