blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2446995

EP2446995 - Device for setting saw blades [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.11.2013
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.12.2013  [2013/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Haas Maschinenbau GmbH
Glockenstahlstrasse 3
42855 Remscheid / DE
[2012/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Haas, Hans R.
Emilienstrasse 56
42853 Remscheid / DE
 [2012/18]
Representative(s)Füssel, Michael
Dr. Sturies, Eichler & Füssel Patentanwaltskanzlei Lönsstrasse 55
42289 Wuppertal / DE
[2012/18]
Application number, filing date11008700.431.10.2011
[2012/18]
Priority number, dateDE2010105023630.10.2010         Original published format: DE102010050236
[2012/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2446995
Date:02.05.2012
Language:DE
[2012/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2012
ClassificationIPC:B23D63/04
[2012/18]
CPC:
B23D63/04 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Schränken von Sägeblättern[2012/18]
English:Device for setting saw blades[2012/18]
French:Dispositif pour avoyer les lames de scie[2012/18]
Examination procedure31.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.11.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/52]
25.02.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2013/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR1222703  (COBURGER HOLZBEARBEITUNGSMASCH) [X] 1-5,8,9,13,14 * page 3, column 1, lines 27-33; figure 8 * [Y] 7;
 [A]FR1006004  (E. LAJUNIAS, P VERGNAUD) [A] 1-15 * figure 4 *;
 [YD]EP0742067  (HAAS HANS ROBERT [DE]) [YD] 7 * figure - *
by applicantDE8627736U
 EP0742067
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.