EP2590170 - Device for playback in a motor vehicle and method for synchronization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH Becker-Göring-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | [2013/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schweikhardt, Markus Lautenbacherstrasse 43 76597 Loffenau / DE | 02 /
Wenckebach, Ulrich Weinbrennerstr. 108 76185 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
Seidel, Matthias Hagwaldstr. 9 76327 Pfinztal / DE | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/19] | Koch Müller Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Maaßstraße 32/1 69123 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11008785.5 | 03.11.2011 | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2590170 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/10, G11B27/36, H04N21/414, G06F1/32, H04N21/43, H04N21/443, H04N21/442, H04W52/02 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
G11B27/10 (EP,US);
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
H04N21/41422 (EP,US);
H04N21/4302 (EP,US);
H04N21/43637 (EP,US);
H04N21/4424 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Wiedergabe in einem Kraftfahrzeug und Verfahren zur Synchronisierung | [2013/19] | English: | Device for playback in a motor vehicle and method for synchronization | [2013/19] | French: | Dispositif de lecture dans un véhicule à moteur et procédé de synchronisation | [2013/19] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/48] | 25.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.02.2017 | 28.02.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.05.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/44] | 24.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/44] | 14.06.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006194549 (JANIK CRAIG M [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraphs [0047] , [0052] * * paragraphs [0059] - [0090] *; | [I]US2004242224 (JANIK CRAIG M [US], et al) [I] 1,4 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0023] , [0023] * * paragraphs [0050] - [0052] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraphs [0070] - [0074] *; | [A]GB2403377 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2051157 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007288102 (KORZIN STEPHANE [FR]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102008051663 | US2007061725 |