EP2457550 - Automated pharmacy admixture system (APAS) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2023 | Opposition rejected | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARxIUM Inc. 96 Nature Park Way Winnipeg, MB R3P 0X8 / CA | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/21] | For all designated states ARxIUM Inc. 360 Main Street, 30th Floor Winnipeg MB R3C 4G1 / CA | ||
Former [2014/40] | For all designated states Intelligent Hospital Systems Inc. 96 Nature Park Way Winnipeg, MB R3P 0X8 / CA | ||
Former [2012/22] | For all designated states Intelligent Hospital Systems Ltd. 96 Nature Park Way Winnipeg, MB R3P 0X8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reinhardt, Alex H. 784 Earl Grey Road St. Andrews Manitoba R1A 3W3 / CA | 02 /
Mlodzinski, Lance R. 112 Dunraven Winnipeg Manitoba R2M 0H6 / CA | 03 /
Doherty, Thom 50 Deer Run Drive Winnipeg Manitoba R3P 2L4 / CA | 04 /
Eliuk, Walter W. 2 Chatham Place Winnipeg Manitoba R3T 4A4 / CA | 05 /
Rob, Ronald H. Box 214a, Rr 2 Dugald Manitoba R0E 0K0 / CA | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Simonnet, Christine, et al Cabinet BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2012/33] | Simonnet, Christine, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2012/22] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11008865.5 | 26.04.2006 | [2012/22] | Priority number, date | US20050681405P | 16.05.2005 Original published format: US 681405 P | US20050316795 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: US 316795 | WO2005US46978 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: PCT/US2005/046978 | US20060389995 | 27.03.2006 Original published format: US 389995 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2457550 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2457550 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2457550 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61J3/00, B65B59/00, B65B31/02 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
A61J3/002 (EP,US);
B65B3/003 (EP);
B65B31/02 (EP);
B65B55/16 (EP);
B65B59/001 (EP,US);
B65B59/003 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/22] | A61J1/00, A61J1/05, B65B59/00, B65B31/02, // A61J3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/22] | Title | German: | Automatisiertes Arzneimittelzubereitungssystem (APAS) | [2012/22] | English: | Automated pharmacy admixture system (APAS) | [2012/22] | French: | Système de mélange automatisé de produits pharmaceutiques (APAS) | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 31.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06751430.7 / EP1889197 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE SWISSLOG ITALIA S.p.A. Via Vittor Pisani, 20 20124 Milano (MI) / IT Opponent's representative Provvisionato, Paolo, et al, et al Provvisionato & Co S.r.l. Piazza di Porta Mascarella 7 40126 Bologna / IT | [2017/08] | 21.02.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.06.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.05.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.05.2018 | 24.05.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.07.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 25.12.2022 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2023/07] | Appeal following opposition | 01.10.2018 | Appeal received No. T2474/18 | 03.12.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.12.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 15.12.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2006 | AT | 13.04.2016 | BE | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | ES | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | IS | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | NL | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | IE | 26.04.2016 | LU | 26.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | FR | 13.06.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 26.04.2006 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.04.2016 | ||
LU | 26.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 13.06.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 26.04.2006 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.04.2016 | ||
LU | 26.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 13.06.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.04.2006 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 13.06.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 13.06.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | BE | 30.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9404415 (BRITISH NUCLEAR FUELS PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 15, line 4 - line 26 * * page 7, line 6 - line 22 * * page 21, line 7 - line 32 * * page 26, line 7 - line 31 ** figures 1,9,10 *; | [XAI]US5431201 (TORCHIA MARK G [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9,11,13 * column 11, line 46 - column 13, line 3 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 3,10,12,14,15 [I] 4,7 | Opposition | GB1168263 | US4842028 | WO9404415 | US5341854 | US5431201 | US5443791 | US5555920 | US2005074363 | US2005224137 |