EP2487397 - Tensioning clamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORMA Germany GmbH Edisonstrasse 4 63477 Maintal / DE | [2012/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krüger, Manfred Finkenweg 6 63654 Büdingen / DE | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch Schlosserstrasse 23 D-60322 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 11009231.9 | 22.11.2011 | [2012/33] | Priority number, date | DE20111010655 | 09.02.2011 Original published format: DE102011010655 | [2012/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2487397 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/04, F16B35/04 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
F16L33/04 (EP,KR,US);
F16B2/10 (KR);
F16B2/06 (KR);
F16B35/041 (EP,US);
F16L23/08 (EP,US);
F16L33/02 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Spannschelle | [2012/33] | English: | Tensioning clamp | [2012/33] | French: | Pince de serrage | [2012/33] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/34] | 03.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5410781 (ANJOS THEODORE R [US], et al) [X] 1-6,12 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2509421 (LEGNANESE MOLLIFICIO [IT]) [X] 1-6,12 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE2919939 (RASMUSSEN GMBH) [Y] 1-12 * page 9 - page 15; figure - *; | [Y]GB2400154 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [Y] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US5967725 (VOGES KARSTEN [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US4810145 (VILLAS HUGO J [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |