EP2463393 - Copper alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 10-26 Wakinohama-cho 2-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-Shi, Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2012/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shishido, Hisao Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 02 /
Katsura, Shinya Chofu Plant in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 14-1, Chofuminato-machi Shimonoseki-shi Yamaguchi 752-0953 / JP | 03 /
Aruga, Yashuhiro Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 04 /
Matsumoto, Katsushi Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11009294.7 | 23.11.2011 | [2012/24] | Priority number, date | JP20100277081 | 13.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010277081 | JP20110040394 | 25.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011040394 | JP20110040393 | 25.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011040393 | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2463393 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C22C9/06, C22C1/02, C22F1/08 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
C22C9/06 (EP,KR,US);
C22C9/00 (KR);
C22C1/02 (EP,US);
C22C9/02 (KR);
C22C9/04 (KR);
C22F1/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kupferlegierung | [2012/24] | English: | Copper alloy | [2012/24] | French: | Alliage de cuivre | [2012/24] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 20.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/23] | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/23] | Divisional application(s) | EP12007912.4 / EP2562280 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2013 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2048251 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0024] , [0067] , [0068] , [0076] *; | [XP]JP2011162848 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [XP] 1-8 * abstract *; | [XP]EP2298945 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-8 * paragraphs [0010] , [0031] , [0033] *; | [X]EP2248922 (DOWA METALTECH CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0025] , [0053] , [0054] , [0060] , [0062] , [0063] , [0064] , [0065] , [0070] - [0072] - [0084] , [0085] , [0095] , [0100] , [0103] * | by applicant | JP2006152392 | JP2009007666 | JP2008013836 | JP2008223136 | JP2010275622 | - Shinichi Nagashima, MARUZEN CO., LTD. | - "Light Metal", Explanation, (1993), vol. 43, pages 285 - 293 | - JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, JAPAN, (200907), vol. 58, no. 7, pages 568 - 574 |