EP2596722 - Furniture for relaxing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTFIT Polierwerkstätte Bendererstrasse 29 9494 Schaan / LI | [2013/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elkuch, Sigmund Im Gapetsch 8 9494 Schaan / LI | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Rosenich, Paul PPR AG Rotenbodenstrasse 12 9497 Triesenberg / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Rosenich, Paul Patentbüro Paul Rosenich AG BGZ 9497 Triesenberg / LI | Application number, filing date | 11009348.1 | 24.11.2011 | [2013/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2596722 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47C3/025 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
A47C3/0251 (EP,US);
A47C3/0252 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Relaxmöbel | [2013/22] | English: | Furniture for relaxing | [2013/22] | French: | Mobilier de relaxation | [2013/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/26] | 22.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR964628 (HARRIS & TYLER LTD) [X] 1,3-10,15 * page 3, column 1, lines 15-18; figure - *; | [X]US2570000 (LOWRY HUBERT E) [X] 1-3,7-10,15 * figure - *; | [I]US2003071502 (MARSHALL RICHARD E [US], et al) [I] 1,11,12 * figure - *; | [X]US1979892 (GEORGE LOEFFLER) [X] 1-3,7,9,10,15 * figure - *; | [X]US2007252419 (TAKAHASHI YUKIE [JP]) [X] 1,3,7-10,15 * paragraph [0038]; figure - * |