EP2462923 - Prevention of molecular weight reduction of the polymer, impurity formation and gelling in polymer compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2014 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oakwood Laboratories L.L.C. 7670 First Place Oakwood, OH 44146 / US | [2012/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thanoo, Bagavathikanun. C. 6584 Glen Coe Drive Brecksville, OH 44141 / US | 02 /
Murtagh, James aaiPharma 2320 Scientific Park Drive Wilmington, NC 28405 / US | 03 /
Johns, Gonto 671 The Burns Berea, OH 44017 / US | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11009427.3 | 19.07.2004 | [2012/24] | Priority number, date | US20030488573P | 18.07.2003 Original published format: US 488573 P | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2462923 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2462923 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/10, A61K47/34, A61K9/16, A61K9/00 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
A61K38/08 (EP,US);
A61K47/34 (US);
A61K38/09 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/1617 (EP,US);
A61K9/1647 (EP,US);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P5/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/24] | A61K9/10, A61K47/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/24] | Title | German: | Vorbeugung der Reduzierung des Molekulargewichts, der Bildung von Verunreinigungen und der Gelbildung in Polymerzusammensetzungen | [2012/24] | English: | Prevention of molecular weight reduction of the polymer, impurity formation and gelling in polymer compositions | [2012/24] | French: | Prévention de la réduction du poids moléculaire du polymère, de la formation d'impuretés et de la gélification de compositions polymères | [2012/24] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 20.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/37] | 11.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/35] | 31.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04778698.3 / EP1660039 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040778698) is 19.11.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 20.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 20.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.07.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2537980 (SANDOZ SA [CH]); | [X]WO9628143 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]WO9832423 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al); | [X]WO9856426 (GENENTECH INC [US]); | [XP]WO2004035762 (ALKERMES INC [US], et al); | by applicant | US3755558 | US3773919 | US4652441 | US4677191 | US4767628 | US4818542 | US4917893 | US4938763 | US4954298 | US5278201 | US5278202 | US5324519 | US5330767 | US5407609 | US5476663 | US5478564 | US5480969 | US5540973 | US5575987 | US5609886 | US5631020 | US5631021 | US5656727 | US5688530 | US5716640 | US5739176 | US5876761 | US5916598 | US5945126 | US6264987 | US6270802 |