EP2463251 - Methods of incorporating materials of interest in glass optical waveguides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schott Corporation 555 Taxter Road Elmsford NY 10523 / US | [2012/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tabor, Kevin F. 5 West Hollow Lane Webster Massachusetts 01570 / US | 02 /
Higby, Paige L. 118 Wales Road Holland Massachusetts 01521 / US | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Herden, Andreas F. Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Herden, Andreas F. Blumbach - Zinngrebe PatentConsult Alexandrastraße 5 D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 11009589.0 | 05.12.2011 | [2012/24] | Priority number, date | US20100459324P | 10.12.2010 Original published format: US 459324 P | US201113308600 | 01.12.2011 Original published format: US201113308600 | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2463251 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2463251 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/012 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
C03B37/01211 (EP,US);
C03B37/01214 (EP,US);
C03B2201/30 (EP,US);
C03B2201/31 (EP,US);
C03B2201/34 (EP,US);
C03B2201/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Einbinden von Materialien von Interessen in Glaslichtwellenleiter | [2012/24] | English: | Methods of incorporating materials of interest in glass optical waveguides | [2012/24] | French: | Procédé de l'incorpration de matériaux d'intérêts dans des guides d'ondes optiques en verre | [2012/24] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 11.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2011 | AL | 04.09.2013 | AT | 04.09.2013 | BE | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | ES | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | HR | 04.09.2013 | IT | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | MK | 04.09.2013 | MT | 04.09.2013 | NL | 04.09.2013 | PL | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | SE | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | SM | 04.09.2013 | TR | 04.09.2013 | NO | 04.12.2013 | RS | 04.12.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | IE | 05.12.2013 | LU | 05.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | PT | 06.01.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 05.12.2011 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MK | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
TR | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IE | 05.12.2013 | ||
LU | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 05.12.2011 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
TR | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IE | 05.12.2013 | ||
LU | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
TR | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IE | 05.12.2013 | ||
LU | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IE | 05.12.2013 | ||
LU | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IE | 05.12.2013 | ||
LU | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IE | 05.12.2013 | ||
LU | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
LU | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
LU | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | |
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 04.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0026711 (UNIV SYRACUSE [US]) [A] 1,15 * example 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5838868 (KROL MARK F [US], et al) [A] 1,15 * column 3, lines 57-62; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US2010251771 (LANGNER ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1,15 * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0094]; claims 1,18 *; | [A]US2005135759 (WANG XINGWU [US], et al) [A] 1,15 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0069] * | [A] - PHILIPP KORNREICH ET AL, "Semiconductor Cylinder Fibers", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19960701), vol. 14, no. 7, ISSN 0733-8724, XP011028601 [A] 1,15 * SCF fabrication; paragraph [00II] * |