EP2475061 - Controller arrangement of an electrical power transfer system of a wind turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2015/23] |
Former [2012/28] | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 44 8200 Aarhus N / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Opina, Gil Jr Lampong 21 Rosewood Drive, 01-05 737917 Singapore / SG | 02 /
Fonn, Swee Yee Blk 535 Upper Cross Street, 11-231 050535 Singapore / SG | 03 /
Tripathi, Anshuman Blk 1 Bukit Batok Street 25, 04-01 658882 Singapore / SG | 04 /
Liaw, Tze Yang c/o Vestas Technology R&D Singapore Pte Ltd. 20 Pasir Panjang Road 14-25 Mapletree Business City 117439 Singapore / SG | 05 /
Gupta, Amit Kumar Blk 601 Clementi West Street 1, 09-04 120601 Singapore / SG | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstraße 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/28] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11010072.4 | 22.12.2011 | [2012/28] | Priority number, date | US20100979918 | 28.12.2010 Original published format: US 979918 | [2012/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2475061 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2475061 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/38 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J3/40 (EP,US);
H02J2300/28 (EP,US);
Y02E10/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Title | German: | Steuergerät-Anordnung für ein elektrisches Stromübertragungssystem einer Windturbine | [2012/28] | English: | Controller arrangement of an electrical power transfer system of a wind turbine | [2012/28] | French: | Agencement de contrôleur d'un système de transfert d'énergie électrique d'une éolienne | [2012/28] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 02.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 03.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/04] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees SE, EE, TR, SM, SK, SI, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 02.05.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 02.05.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.05.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2011 | AL | 18.02.2015 | AT | 18.02.2015 | BE | 18.02.2015 | BG | 18.02.2015 | CY | 18.02.2015 | CZ | 18.02.2015 | DK | 18.02.2015 | EE | 18.02.2015 | FI | 18.02.2015 | HR | 18.02.2015 | IT | 18.02.2015 | LT | 18.02.2015 | LV | 18.02.2015 | MC | 18.02.2015 | MK | 18.02.2015 | MT | 18.02.2015 | NL | 18.02.2015 | PL | 18.02.2015 | PT | 18.02.2015 | RO | 18.02.2015 | RS | 18.02.2015 | SE | 18.02.2015 | SI | 18.02.2015 | SK | 18.02.2015 | SM | 18.02.2015 | TR | 18.02.2015 | NO | 18.05.2015 | GR | 19.05.2015 | IS | 18.06.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AT | 18.02.2015 | ||
BE | 18.02.2015 | ||
BG | 18.02.2015 | ||
CY | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
MK | 18.02.2015 | ||
MT | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PT | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
SM | 18.02.2015 | ||
TR | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AT | 18.02.2015 | ||
BE | 18.02.2015 | ||
BG | 18.02.2015 | ||
CY | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
MT | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
SM | 18.02.2015 | ||
TR | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
BE | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
BE | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.02.2015 | |
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.02.2015 | |
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.02.2015 | |
NO | 18.05.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1863162 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP2161443 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [AD] 1-14* the whole document *; | [XP]EP2362534 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [XP] 1-3,6-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2161443 |