EP2345607 - Trolley and overhead transport assembly with such trolleys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states psb intralogistics GmbH Blocksbergstrasse 145 66955 Pirmasens / DE | [2011/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dietz, Lothar Hauptstraße 18 66999, Hinterweidenthal / DE | 02 /
Neuber, Wolfgang Pirmasenser Str. 22 66504, Bottenbach / DE | 03 /
Hartig, Uwe Brucknerstraße 6 66802, Überherrn / DE | [2013/22] |
Former [2011/29] | 01 /
Dietz, Lothar Hauptstraße 18 66999, Hinterweidenthal / DE | ||
02 /
Neuber, Wolfgang Pirmasenser Str. 22 66504, Bottenbach / DE | |||
03 /
Hartig, Uwe Brucknerstraße 6 66802, Überherrn / DE | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/29] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11150019.5 | 03.01.2011 | [2011/29] | Priority number, date | DE20101000064 | 13.01.2010 Original published format: DE102010000064 | [2011/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2345607 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2345607 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65G19/02, B65G47/61, B65G9/00, B61B10/02 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
B65G19/025 (EP);
B65G47/61 (EP);
B65G9/002 (EP);
B65G2201/0229 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/29] | Title | German: | Rollläufer und Hängeförderanlage mit Rollläufern | [2011/29] | English: | Trolley and overhead transport assembly with such trolleys | [2011/29] | French: | Chariot de transport suspendu et installation de transport suspendu dotée de tels chariots | [2011/29] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 20.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.01.2011 | AL | 05.06.2013 | CY | 05.06.2013 | CZ | 05.06.2013 | DK | 05.06.2013 | EE | 05.06.2013 | FI | 05.06.2013 | HR | 05.06.2013 | LT | 05.06.2013 | LV | 05.06.2013 | MC | 05.06.2013 | MK | 05.06.2013 | MT | 05.06.2013 | PL | 05.06.2013 | RO | 05.06.2013 | RS | 05.06.2013 | SE | 05.06.2013 | SI | 05.06.2013 | SK | 05.06.2013 | SM | 05.06.2013 | TR | 05.06.2013 | BG | 05.09.2013 | NO | 05.09.2013 | GR | 06.09.2013 | IS | 05.10.2013 | PT | 07.10.2013 | IE | 03.01.2014 | LU | 03.01.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 03.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 03.01.2014 | ||
LU | 03.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 03.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 03.01.2014 | ||
LU | 03.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 03.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 03.01.2014 | ||
LU | 03.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CY | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 03.01.2014 | ||
LU | 03.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 03.01.2014 | ||
LU | 03.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 03.01.2014 | ||
LU | 03.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 03.01.2014 | ||
LU | 03.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 03.01.2014 | ||
LU | 03.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
LU | 03.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 05.06.2013 | |
NO | 05.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE9217954U (GÄRTNER) [X] 1,3,5-7,9 * paragraph 2 - page 6; figures 1,2,4,6-10 * * page 12, paragraph 4 - page 13, paragraph 1 * [Y] 2,8,11,12; | [X]FR2142980 (PFALZSTAHLBAU GMBH) [X] 1,5,6 * figures 10,11 *; | [Y]EP1645189 (NORMANDIE MANUTENTION NORMAN [FR]) [Y] 2,12 * paragraph [0016]; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0400702 (GEERTS VEEN CATHARINA AFIEN [NL], et al) [Y] 8 * figure 2 *; | [I]US3074356 (PARKER HUMPHREY F, et al) [I] 1,9,10 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE102006049754 (DUERKOPP ADLER AG [DE]) [Y] 11 * figures 3,4; claim 1 *; | [A]US3807314 (SLEMMONS A) [A] 8 * column 3, line 10 - line 30; figure 3 *; | [A]EP1544136 (PEP FOERDERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5897004 (NEUGEBAUER KARL [SE], et al) [A] 8 * figure 3 * | by applicant | EP2128051 |