EP2343850 - Method and system for enabling resource block bundling in lte-a systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Lingjia C/O Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Nam, Young Han C/O Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Zhang, Jianzhong C/O Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2017/34] |
Former [2011/28] | 01 /
Liu, Lingjia C/O Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Nam, Young Han C/O Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Zhang, Jianzhong C/O Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2011/28] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 11150088.0 | 04.01.2011 | [2011/28] | Priority number, date | US20100294010P | 11.01.2010 Original published format: US 294010 P | US20100970717 | 16.12.2010 Original published format: US 970717 | [2011/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2343850 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2343850 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2343850 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L25/03, H04L25/02 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0478 (US);
H04L1/0026 (KR);
H04L25/03343 (EP,KR,US);
H04L25/03898 (US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/28] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2011/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Ermöglichung der Ressourcenblockbündlung in LTE-A-Systemen | [2011/28] | English: | Method and system for enabling resource block bundling in lte-a systems | [2011/28] | French: | Procédé et système pour activer le regroupement de blocs de ressources dans des systèmes lte-a | [2011/28] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 27.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14171879.1 / EP2779516 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.01.2011 | AL | 23.08.2017 | AT | 23.08.2017 | CY | 23.08.2017 | CZ | 23.08.2017 | DK | 23.08.2017 | EE | 23.08.2017 | ES | 23.08.2017 | FI | 23.08.2017 | HR | 23.08.2017 | LT | 23.08.2017 | LV | 23.08.2017 | MC | 23.08.2017 | MK | 23.08.2017 | PL | 23.08.2017 | PT | 23.08.2017 | RO | 23.08.2017 | RS | 23.08.2017 | SE | 23.08.2017 | SI | 23.08.2017 | SK | 23.08.2017 | SM | 23.08.2017 | TR | 23.08.2017 | BG | 23.11.2017 | NO | 23.11.2017 | GR | 24.11.2017 | IS | 23.12.2017 | IE | 04.01.2018 | LU | 04.01.2018 | MT | 04.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 04.01.2011 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CY | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
MK | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PT | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 04.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
MT | 04.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 04.01.2011 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PT | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 04.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
MT | 04.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 04.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
MT | 04.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 04.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
MT | 04.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 04.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 04.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 23.08.2017 | |
NO | 23.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009080549 (KHAN FAROOQ [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0066] *; | [X] - CATT, "Discussion on precoding granularity for downlink MIMO", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-093541, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090819), no. Shenzhen, China; 20090819, XP050351800 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "UE-RS Patterns for LTE-A", (20090824), pages 1 - 9, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #58 R1-093105,, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_58/Docs/, XP008157183 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [I] - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "UE-RS Patterns for ranks 5 to 8 of LTE-A", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-094212 UE RS PATTERNS FOR RANK 5-8, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091012), no. Miyazaki; 20091012, XP050388682 [I] 1-20 * the whole document * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Discussion on DM-RS for LTE-Advanced", (20091012), pages 1 - 4, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #58BIS R1-094088,, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/wg1_rl1/TSGR1_58b/Docs/, XP008157181 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | US20100294010 | US20100394010 |