Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
26.08.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.03.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
07.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.02.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.09.2012 | Publication of search report | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
28.09.2012 | Change - classification | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
01.07.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
01.07.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |