EP2345908 - Automatic adjustment of scan angle, scan depth and scan speed in an ultrasound system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medison Co., Ltd. 114 Yangdukwon-ri Nam-myun Hongchun-gun Kangwon-do 250-875 / KR | [2011/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoo, Bong Soo Medison Co., Ltd. 3FL, R&D Center, Medison Building 1003 Daechi-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-851 / KR | 02 /
Kim, Yun Jin 3 Fl., R&D Center, Medison Co., Ltd., Medison Building 1003 Daechi-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-851 / KR | [2011/29] | Representative(s) | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/29] | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 11150364.5 | 07.01.2011 | [2011/29] | Priority number, date | KR20100002708 | 12.01.2010 Original published format: KR 20100002708 | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2345908 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2345908 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/52, G01S15/89 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
G01S7/5205 (EP,US);
G01S7/52085 (EP,US);
G01S15/8993 (EP,US);
G01S7/52063 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/29] | G01S7/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Automatische Einstellung eines Abtastwinkels, Abtasttiefe und Abtastgeschwindigkeit in einem Ultraschallsystem | [2011/29] | English: | Automatic adjustment of scan angle, scan depth and scan speed in an ultrasound system | [2011/29] | French: | Réglage automatique de l'angle de balayage, de la profondeur de balayage et de la vitesse de balayage dans un système à ultrasons | [2011/29] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 18.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP1235080 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-3,8-10,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraphs [0025] , [0 27] , [0 29] * * paragraphs [0031] , [0 35] , [0 36] * * paragraphs [0050] , [0 51] * [A] 4,5,11,12; | [A]US2004187582 (SATOH TOMOO [JP]) [A] 1,8,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0060] *; | [A]US2004267123 (MCMORROW GERALD J [US], et al) [A] 1,8,15 * abstract ** paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0024] * |