EP2474748 - Metal wall anchor for a screw [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker, Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, DE 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | For all designated states Black & Decker, Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, DE 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Villatte, Didier 100 Rud de Fromont 91130 Ris-Orangis / FR | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | SBD IPAdmin 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11150522.8 | 10.01.2011 | [2012/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2474748 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2474748 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16B13/12, F16B13/00, F16B13/08, F16B13/06 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
F16B13/0808 (EP,US);
F16B13/001 (EP,US);
F16B13/061 (EP,US);
F16B13/122 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/28] | F16B13/12, F16B13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2012/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Metallwandanker für eine Schraube | [2012/28] | English: | Metal wall anchor for a screw | [2012/28] | French: | Ancrage de mur métallique pour une vis | [2012/28] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 15.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2011 | AL | 16.03.2016 | AT | 16.03.2016 | BE | 16.03.2016 | CY | 16.03.2016 | CZ | 16.03.2016 | DK | 16.03.2016 | EE | 16.03.2016 | ES | 16.03.2016 | FI | 16.03.2016 | HR | 16.03.2016 | IT | 16.03.2016 | LT | 16.03.2016 | LV | 16.03.2016 | MC | 16.03.2016 | MK | 16.03.2016 | NL | 16.03.2016 | PL | 16.03.2016 | RO | 16.03.2016 | RS | 16.03.2016 | SE | 16.03.2016 | SI | 16.03.2016 | SK | 16.03.2016 | SM | 16.03.2016 | TR | 16.03.2016 | BG | 16.06.2016 | NO | 16.06.2016 | GR | 17.06.2016 | IS | 16.07.2016 | PT | 18.07.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 10.01.2011 | |
AL | 16.03.2016 | ||
AT | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 10.01.2011 | |
AL | 16.03.2016 | ||
AT | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.01.2011 | |
AL | 16.03.2016 | ||
AT | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 16.03.2016 | |
AT | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]GB2379722 (JOKER IND CO LTD [TW], et al) [ID] 1-15 * page 4, line 4 - line 26; figures 2,3,5 * * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 14; figures 6,7 *; | [A]US2147357 (SCHOLTES ALBERT J) [A] 1,7,13 * page 1, column r, line 26 - page 2, column r, line 9; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3416797 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | by applicant | GB2140889 | GB2379722 | EP1338803 | GB2289006 |