|
19.02.2024 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
14.02.2017 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
20.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.09.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.07.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2011 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.05.2011 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
44 |