29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
23.02.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
14.04.2017 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
17.03.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] |
10.03.2017 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
10.03.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
10.03.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.03.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.03.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
03.03.2017 |
Change - German title |
published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] |
03.03.2017 |
Change - English title |
published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] |
03.03.2017 |
Change - French title |
published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] |
01.02.2017 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
29.09.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.05.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.02.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.09.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.11.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.08.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.04.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.04.2012 |
First examination report |
|
23.12.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] |
16.12.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.10.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
28.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.05.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] |
18.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|