12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
01.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
17.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
11.07.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
06.06.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
14.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
10.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
02.08.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
29.07.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.07.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.03.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.03.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
01.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.10.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.08.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.07.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
08.06.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
08.06.2012 |
First examination report |
|
01.05.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.03.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|