Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8512410 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2013 | B2 | US2012179263 | 12.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11150615 | 11.01.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2474288 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2013 | B1 | EP2474288 | 11.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11150615 | 11.01.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2474288T | 02.12.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP11150615 | 11.01.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2438168T | 16.01.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP11150615 | 11.01.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2474288T | 28.02.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP11150615 | 11.01.2011 |