EP2474288 - Stemless shoulder implant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arthrex, Inc. 1370 Creekside Boulevard Naples, FL 34108-1945 / US | [2012/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Metcalfe, Nick Igelgarten 1 82166, Gräfelfing / DE | 02 /
Michel, Gerlinde Augustenfelder Str. 22c 80999, Munich / DE | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Lohr, Georg Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim / München / DE | [2012/28] | Application number, filing date | 11150615.0 | 11.01.2011 | [2012/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2474288 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2474288 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/40, // A61F2/30 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
A61F2/40 (EP,US);
A61F2/4003 (EP,US);
A61F2/4014 (EP,US);
A61F2/30771 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30331 (EP,US);
A61F2002/305 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30507 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30851 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30858 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30861 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30863 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30873 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Title | German: | Stammloses Schulterimplantat | [2012/28] | English: | Stemless shoulder implant | [2012/28] | French: | Implant d'épaule sans joint | [2012/28] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 30.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.01.2011 | AL | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | HR | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | MK | 04.09.2013 | MT | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | RS | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | SM | 04.09.2013 | NO | 04.12.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | PT | 06.01.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 11.01.2011 | |
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MK | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
RS | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.01.2011 | |
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
RS | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 04.09.2013 | |
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
RS | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 04.09.2013 | |
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 04.09.2013 | |
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | |
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 04.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO2007041879 (PLUS ORTHOPEDICS AG [CH], et al) [YD] 1,2,8-11 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 4; figure 7 *; | [Y]EP0578345 (ARTOS MED PRODUKTE [DE]) [Y] 1,2,8-11 * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 5 *; | [A]CH677072 (SCHENKER EMIL AG) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 46 - column 1, line 55; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0299889 (UNIV BOURGOGNE [FR]) [A] 1-11 * figure 8 *; | [A]WO2009143057 (LINARES MEDICAL DEVICES LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 1,3 *; | [AD]WO03005933 (BIOMET INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [AD]FR2876899 (DEPUY IRELAND LTD [IE], et al) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE202009011293U (STEMCUP MEDICAL PRODUCTS AG [CH]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0020]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE19755246 (AESCULAP AG & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * figure 11 * | by applicant | US7819923 | US2009210065 | US2009306782 |