EP2383912 - Input device and control method of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soh, Byung-seok Heungdeok-maeul 5-danji Hoban Vertium Apt. 508-40 Yeongdoek-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Choi, Sang-on Kunyoung Apt. 423-105, Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Choi, Yong-wan Imaechon Hanshin Apt. 205-1303, Imae-dong, Bundan-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2013/09] |
Former [2011/44] | Bruce, Alexander Richard Henry, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 11150628.3 | 11.01.2011 | [2011/44] | Priority number, date | KR20100039646 | 28.04.2010 Original published format: KR 20100039646 | KR20100069659 | 19.07.2010 Original published format: KR 20100069659 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2383912 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2383912 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0354 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
G06F3/03542 (EP,US);
G06F3/037 (EP,US);
G06F3/0386 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/44] | H04B15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Eingabevorrichtung und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2011/44] | English: | Input device and control method of the same | [2011/44] | French: | Dispositif d'entrée et procédé de commande de celui-ci | [2011/44] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/35] | 04.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4859814 (SCIACERO JAMES R [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 2, line 44 - line 48 * * column 2, line 68 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 13 * * column 8, line 45 - line 68; figures 2, 3, 8 *; | [Y]US6377250 (RAVIV RONI [IL], et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 1, line 26 - line 34 * * column 4, line 25 - line 33 * * column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 43; figures 3-6, 9-11, 15, 17 *; | [A]US2009167726 (SPRAGUE RANDALL B [US], et al) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0014] , [0 15] , [0 18]; figures 1, 3 * |