07.01.2022 |
Refusal of application |
published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] |
19.09.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
07.09.2021 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
25.03.2021 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
29.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.08.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.06.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
31.01.2020 |
First examination report |
|
28.01.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.02.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
09.02.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.02.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
09.02.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
31.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.06.2017 |
Publication of search report |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
30.06.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
30.06.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
27.02.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
03.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.03.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.03.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
01.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] |