Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8924163 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2014 | B2 | US2013282335 | 24.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313918472 | 14.06.2013 | US68873610 | 15.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104764623B | Global Dossier | 08.12.2017 | B | CN104764623 | 08.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201110009278 | 17.01.2011 | US68873610 | 15.01.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8478548 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2013 | B2 | US2011178737 | 21.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68873610 | 15.01.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5801559B | Global Dossier | 28.10.2015 | B2 | JP2011145295 | 28.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US68873610 | 15.01.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102192825B | Global Dossier | 20.05.2015 | B | CN102192825 | 21.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US68873610 | 15.01.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2345878 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2017 | A3 | EP2345878 | 20.07.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US68873610 | 15.01.2010 |