EP2302259 - Mechanical gearbox for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FERRARI S.p.A. Via Emilia Est, 1163 Modena / IT | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roncaglia, Roberto Viale Terra delle Rosse 41053, POZZA DI MARANELLO / IT | 02 /
Rioli, Mauro Via Reni, 28 41049, SASSUOLO / IT | [2012/37] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
Roncaglia, Roberto Viale Terra delle Rosse 41053, POZZA DI MARANELLO / IT | ||
02 /
Rioli, Mauro Via Reni, 28 41049, SASSUOLO / IT | Representative(s) | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2013/23] |
Former [2012/37] | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2011/13] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 11151054.1 | 10.07.2008 | [2011/13] | Priority number, date | IT2007BO00473 | 11.07.2007 Original published format: IT BO20070473 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2302259 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2302259 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | [2011/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2302259 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/089, F16H63/18 | [2011/21] | CPC: |
F16H63/18 (EP,US);
F16H3/089 (EP,US);
F16H61/32 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19284 (US);
Y10T74/19312 (US)
|
Former IPC [2011/13] | F16H3/089, F16H63/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | Mechanisches Getriebe für Fahrzeuge | [2011/13] | English: | Mechanical gearbox for motor vehicles | [2011/13] | French: | Transmission méchanique pour véhicules | [2011/13] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 28.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08788875.6 / EP2171309 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080788875) is 03.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.07.2008 | AT | 12.09.2012 | BE | 12.09.2012 | CY | 12.09.2012 | CZ | 12.09.2012 | DK | 12.09.2012 | EE | 12.09.2012 | FI | 12.09.2012 | HR | 12.09.2012 | IT | 12.09.2012 | LT | 12.09.2012 | LV | 12.09.2012 | MC | 12.09.2012 | MT | 12.09.2012 | NL | 12.09.2012 | PL | 12.09.2012 | RO | 12.09.2012 | SE | 12.09.2012 | SI | 12.09.2012 | SK | 12.09.2012 | TR | 12.09.2012 | BG | 12.12.2012 | NO | 12.12.2012 | GR | 13.12.2012 | ES | 23.12.2012 | IS | 12.01.2013 | PT | 14.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
MT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
TR | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | FI | 12.09.2012 | |
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 12.09.2012 | |
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | FI | 12.09.2012 | |
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 12.09.2012 | |
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 12.09.2012 | |
NO | 12.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH0419462 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1,2 * figure 6 *; | [A]EP1031769 (GETRAG GETRIEBE ZAHNRAD [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1279869 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [AD]US2004192499 (SAKAMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [AD] 1,2 * paragraph [0046]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE10340149 (GETRAG GETRIEBE ZAHNRAD [DE]) [A] 1,2* figure 1 * | by applicant | JPH0419462 | US2004192499 |