EP2476388 - Osteosynthesis plate, in particular radius plate or ulnar plate, for stabilising bone fractures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/29] | Osteosynthesis plate, in particular radius plate or ulnar plate, for stabilising bone fractures | ||
[2014/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HG Medical GmbH Gewerbegebiet 16 82399 Raisting / DE | [2012/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagenmeyer, Johannes Von-Eichendorff-Str. 51 86911 Dießen / DE | [2012/37] |
Former [2012/29] | 01 /
Hagenmeyer, Johannes Von-Eichendorff-Str. 51 86911, Dießen / DE | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Kay Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Rupprecht, Kay Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/29] | Rupprecht, Kay Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 47-50 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11151143.2 | 17.01.2011 | [2014/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2476388 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2476388 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/80 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
A61B17/8014 (EP);
A61B17/8061 (EP);
A61B17/8057 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/29] | Title | German: | Osteosyntheseplatte, insbesondere Radiusplatte oder Ulnarplatte, zur Stabilisierung von Knochenfrakturen | [2014/44] | English: | Osteosynthesis plate, in particular radius plate or ulnar plate, for stabilising bone fractures | [2014/44] | French: | Plaque d'ostéosynthèse, notamment plaque radiale ou plaque Ulnar, destinée à la stabilisation de fractures d'os | [2014/44] |
Former [2012/29] | Osteosyntheseplatte, insbesondere Radiusplatte oder Ulnarplatte, zur Stabilisierung von Knochenfrakturen | ||
Former [2012/29] | Osteosynthesis plate, in particular radius plate or ulnar plate, for stabilising bone fractures | ||
Former [2012/29] | Plaque d'ostéosynthèse, notamment plaque radiale ou plaque Ulnar, destinée à la stabilisation de fractures d'os | Examination procedure | 07.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 05.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.01.2011 | AL | 29.10.2014 | BG | 29.10.2014 | CY | 29.10.2014 | CZ | 29.10.2014 | DK | 29.10.2014 | EE | 29.10.2014 | ES | 29.10.2014 | FI | 29.10.2014 | HR | 29.10.2014 | IT | 29.10.2014 | LT | 29.10.2014 | LV | 29.10.2014 | MC | 29.10.2014 | MK | 29.10.2014 | MT | 29.10.2014 | NL | 29.10.2014 | PL | 29.10.2014 | RO | 29.10.2014 | RS | 29.10.2014 | SE | 29.10.2014 | SI | 29.10.2014 | SK | 29.10.2014 | SM | 29.10.2014 | TR | 29.10.2014 | IE | 17.01.2015 | LU | 17.01.2015 | NO | 29.01.2015 | GR | 30.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | IS | 28.02.2015 | PT | 02.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 17.01.2011 | |
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MK | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
TR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 17.01.2015 | ||
LU | 17.01.2015 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 17.01.2011 | |
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
TR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 17.01.2015 | ||
LU | 17.01.2015 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 17.01.2015 | ||
LU | 17.01.2015 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 17.01.2015 | ||
LU | 17.01.2015 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 17.01.2015 | ||
LU | 17.01.2015 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 17.01.2015 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 17.01.2015 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 17.01.2015 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 29.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005070904 (GERLACH DARIN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-10 * page 4, paragraph 52 - page 5, paragraph 55 * * figures 2B, 10, 11, , 2118 * [I] 3-5; | [XA]US2007123880 (MEDOFF ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1,6-10 * page 3, paragraph 47 - page 4, paragraph 62 * * figures 5, 6, 9, 10 * [A] 3; | [XA]US2004102775 (HUEBNER RANDALL J [US]) [X] 1,6-10 * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 4, paragraph 40 * * page 7, paragraphs 69-75 * * figures 3-7, 11 * [A] 3,5; | [XA]US2006264949 (KOHUT GEORGES [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10 * page 4, paragraphs 55-58 * * figure 13 * [A] 3-6 | by applicant | WO02096309 |