EP2353935 - Headlamp actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 8-3, Takanawa 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8711 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 8-3, Takanawa 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8711 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tajima, Keiichi c/o Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Shizuoka Plant 500, Kitawaki, Shizuoka-shi Shimizu-ku Shizuoka / JP | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11151218.2 | 18.01.2011 | [2011/32] | Priority number, date | JP20100021353 | 02.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010021353 | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2353935 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2353935 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/076, B60Q1/10, B60Q1/12 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
B60Q1/076 (EP,KR,US);
B60Q1/10 (EP,US);
B60Q1/12 (EP,US);
F21V14/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2011/32] | B60Q1/076 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stellantrieb für Fahrzeugscheinwerfer | [2011/32] | English: | Headlamp actuator | [2011/32] | French: | Actionneur pour projecteur | [2011/32] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 20.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDAY]DE102007028112 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [XD] 5 * paragraphs [0031] - [0074]; figures 1-9 * [A] 2,3,6 [Y] 1,4; | [Y]EP2055528 (TYC BROTHER IND CO LTD [TW]) [Y] 1,4 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0028] , [0029]; figure 6 *; | [A]JP2008300363 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US2005141234 (TAJIMA KEIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008225543 (KUWAHARA SIGERU [JP], et al) [A] 1,3-5 * paragraphs [0035] - [0088]; figures 1,2,5,6 *; | [A]JP2010013047 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2007128856 | JP2008094275 | JP2008123855 |