EP2357160 - Method of manufacturing optical fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuraseko, Hiroshi c/o Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Ciyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
Orita, Nobuaki c/o Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 03 /
Nakajima, Yasuo c/o Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 04 /
Kasahara, Minoru c/o Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 05 /
Ui, Keisuke c/o Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2018/24] |
Former [2011/33] | 01 /
Kuraseko, Hiroshi c/o Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Ciyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | ||
02 /
Orita, Nobuaki c/o Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | |||
03 /
Nakajima, Yasuo c/o Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | |||
04 /
Kasahara, Minoru c/o Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | |||
05 /
Ui, Keisuke c/o Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/24] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/33] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11151227.3 | 18.01.2011 | [2011/33] | Priority number, date | JP20100009291 | 19.01.2010 Original published format: JP 2010009291 | JP20110001390 | 06.01.2011 Original published format: JP 2011001390 | [2011/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2357160 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2357160 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C03C25/12, C03C25/62 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
C03C25/12 (EP,US);
C03C25/6226 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/33] | C03C25/12, B29C35/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] |
Former [2011/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung optischer Fasern | [2011/33] | English: | Method of manufacturing optical fiber | [2011/33] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de fibre optique | [2011/33] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 27.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2011 | AL | 13.06.2018 | AT | 13.06.2018 | CY | 13.06.2018 | CZ | 13.06.2018 | DK | 13.06.2018 | EE | 13.06.2018 | ES | 13.06.2018 | FI | 13.06.2018 | HR | 13.06.2018 | IT | 13.06.2018 | LT | 13.06.2018 | LV | 13.06.2018 | MC | 13.06.2018 | MK | 13.06.2018 | NL | 13.06.2018 | PL | 13.06.2018 | RO | 13.06.2018 | RS | 13.06.2018 | SE | 13.06.2018 | SI | 13.06.2018 | SK | 13.06.2018 | SM | 13.06.2018 | TR | 13.06.2018 | BG | 13.09.2018 | NO | 13.09.2018 | GR | 14.09.2018 | IS | 13.10.2018 | PT | 15.10.2018 | GB | 18.01.2019 | IE | 18.01.2019 | LU | 18.01.2019 | MT | 18.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 18.01.2011 | |
AL | 13.06.2018 | ||
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
PT | 15.10.2018 | ||
GB | 18.01.2019 | ||
IE | 18.01.2019 | ||
LU | 18.01.2019 | ||
MT | 18.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
PT | 15.10.2018 | ||
GB | 18.01.2019 | ||
IE | 18.01.2019 | ||
LU | 18.01.2019 | ||
MT | 18.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
GB | 18.01.2019 | ||
IE | 18.01.2019 | ||
LU | 18.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
GB | 18.01.2019 | ||
IE | 18.01.2019 | ||
LU | 18.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
GB | 18.01.2019 | ||
LU | 18.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
GB | 18.01.2019 | ||
LU | 18.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10338552 (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 1-4 * figures 1,2; examples 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5942020 (MARCELISSEN JOHN T [CA]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, lines 18-51 * * column 2, line 35 - column 4, line 37 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1088638 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] - [0012] - [0024] - [0029]; figures 1-3; claims 1-23 *; | [A]JP2005162523 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-4* figures 1-9; claims 1-10 *; | [XD]JP2005224689 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [XD] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] - [0014] - [0043] - [0054]; figures 1-8; claims 1-18 * | Examination | JP2004067421 | by applicant | JPH06211545 | JP2005224689 |