EP2348516 - Railway sensor including a coreless transformer with high galvanic insulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rwaytech Europa 3 - 2ème avenue International Business Park 74160 Archamps / FR | [2011/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ciclet, Jean-Paul 635, avenue Victor Hugo 74800, Amancy / FR | 02 /
Gillard, Bernard 1, rue des Hutins 74160, Saint Julien en Genevois / FR | [2020/38] |
Former [2011/30] | 01 /
Ciclet, Jean-Paul 635, avenue Victor Hugo 74800, Amancy / FR | ||
02 /
Gillard, Bernard 1, rue des Hutins 74160, Saint Julien en Genevois / FR | Representative(s) | Novaimo Europa 1 362, avenue Marie Curie Archamps Technopole 74166 Saint-Julien-en-Genevois Cedex / FR | [2023/30] |
Former [2020/38] | Novaimo Europa 1 362, avenue Marie Curie Archamps Technopole 74166 Saint Julien-en-Genevois Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2013/07] | Novaimo Bâtiment Europa 2 310 avenue Marie Curie Archamps Technopole 74166 Saint Julien en Genevois Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2011/30] | Novaimo B.P. 50038 74802 La Roche-sur-Foron Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 11151262.0 | 18.01.2011 | [2011/30] | Priority number, date | FR20100050405 | 21.01.2010 Original published format: FR 1050405 | [2011/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2348516 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2348516 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/38] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2348516 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01F30/08, H01F38/14, H01F5/00, H01F27/28 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
H01F27/2804 (EP);
H01F5/003 (EP);
H01F2027/2819 (EP);
H01F2038/143 (EP);
H01F30/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/30] | H01F27/28, H01F5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] |
Former [2011/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Eisenbahnsensor mit einem kernlosen Transformator mit höher galvanischer Trennung | [2011/30] | English: | Railway sensor including a coreless transformer with high galvanic insulation | [2011/30] | French: | Capteur ferroviaire à transformateur sans noyau à haute isolation galvanique | [2011/30] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 07.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2016 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 14.03.2016 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 18.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.06.2021
11.06.2021
ADMISSIBLE Knick Elektronische Messgeräte GmbH & Co. KG Beuckestraße 22 14163 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2021/29] | 30.06.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.10.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.10.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.10.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.03.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 20.06.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 21.12.2022 | Appeal received No. T2656/22 | 21.12.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 06.03.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2011 | AL | 16.09.2020 | AT | 16.09.2020 | CY | 16.09.2020 | DK | 16.09.2020 | EE | 16.09.2020 | ES | 16.09.2020 | FI | 16.09.2020 | HR | 16.09.2020 | LT | 16.09.2020 | LV | 16.09.2020 | MC | 16.09.2020 | MK | 16.09.2020 | MT | 16.09.2020 | NL | 16.09.2020 | PL | 16.09.2020 | RO | 16.09.2020 | RS | 16.09.2020 | SE | 16.09.2020 | SI | 16.09.2020 | SK | 16.09.2020 | SM | 16.09.2020 | TR | 16.09.2020 | BG | 16.12.2020 | NO | 16.12.2020 | GR | 17.12.2020 | IS | 16.01.2021 | GB | 18.01.2021 | IE | 18.01.2021 | LU | 18.01.2021 | PT | 18.01.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 18.01.2011 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
MK | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
TR | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
GB | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 18.01.2011 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
MK | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
GB | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 18.01.2011 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
GB | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
GB | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
GB | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
GB | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
GB | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
GB | 18.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 16.09.2020 | |
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | EE | 16.09.2020 | |
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | EE | 16.09.2020 | |
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
NO | 16.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2003008619 (WERNER RAYMOND J [US]) [Y] 10-12 * paragraphs [0019] , [0031] * [A] 1; | [A]US2004239465 (CHEN JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0003] , [00 6] - [0009]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2008040179 (UNIV CITY HONG KONG [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 10; figure 1 * * page 11, line 1 - page 11, line 4 *; | [XYI]US2008278275 (FOUQUET JULIE E [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9 * paragraphs [0035] , [0039] , [0047] , [0059] , [0065] , [0070] , [0053]; figures 1,2,3,20,24,26,16,17,18 * [Y] 10-12 [I] 6,13-15 | Examination | EP0491214 | US2003095027 | - TANG S C ET AL, "Characterization of coreless printed circuit board (PCB) transformers", POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE, 1999. PESC 99. 30TH ANNUAL I EEE CHARLESTON, SC, USA 27 JUNE-1 JULY 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990627), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/PESC.1999.785593, ISBN 978-0-7803-5421-0, pages 746 - 752, XP010346787 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PESC.1999.785593 | Opposition | JPH08306540 | US2006039169 | US2008179963 | - Anonymous, "Durchkontaktierung", Wikipedia, pages 1 - 2, XP055815860 | - S.C. TANG et al., "A Low-Profile Wide-Band Three-Port Isolation Amplifier With Coreless Printed-Circuit-Board (PCB) Transformers", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, (20011200), vol. 48, no. 6, pages 1180 - 1187, XP011023915 |