EP2359922 - Method of preparing organometallic compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lipiecki, Francis J. 321 Walnut Street Haddonfield, NJ 08033 / US | 02 /
Maroldo, Stephen G. 701 Judie Lane Ambler, PA 19002 / US | 03 /
Ware, Robert A. 124 Brook Street Wellesley, MA 02482 / US | 04 /
Shenai-Khatkhate, Deodatta Vinayak 5 Surrey Lane Danvers, MA 019223 / US | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11151414.7 | 19.01.2011 | [2011/34] | Priority number, date | US20100701517 | 05.02.2010 Original published format: US 701517 | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2359922 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/00, B01D53/02, B01D53/04, B01J19/00, C07B47/00, C07B61/00, C07C67/54, C07C69/653, C07F5/06, C07F7/30, C23C16/00 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
B01D3/14 (EP,US);
C07F7/30 (EP,KR,US);
C07B63/00 (EP,US);
C07F15/0046 (EP,US);
C07F5/00 (EP,US);
C07F5/06 (KR);
C07F5/061 (EP,US);
C07F5/062 (EP,US);
C07F5/069 (EP,US);
C07F7/00 (EP,US);
C07F7/28 (EP,US);
C23C16/00 (EP,US);
C23C16/18 (EP,US);
C23C16/4402 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
Y02P20/54 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von organometallischen Verbindungen | [2011/34] | English: | Method of preparing organometallic compounds | [2011/34] | French: | Procédé de préparation de composés organométalliques | [2011/34] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 01.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/24] | 18.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2020258 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-9 * pages 1-12; examples 1-2 *; | [A] - LIM BOOYONG S ET AL, "Synthesis and characterization of volatile, thermally stable, reactive transition metal amidinates.", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY 1 DEC 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:14632513, (20031201), vol. 42, no. 24, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 7951 - 7958, XP002635491 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/IC0345424 | [A] - DAGORNE S ET AL, "Synthesis and structures of cationic aluminum and gallium amidinate complexes", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY 20000119 US LNKD- DOI:10.1021/JA992104J, (20000119), vol. 122, no. 2, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 274 - 289, XP002635492 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JA992104J | by applicant | US4506815 | US5755885 | US6444038 | US6495707 | US6537506 | US6607785 | US2004254389 |