EP2336147 - A beta immunogenic peptide carrier conjugates and methods of producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Alzheimer Immunotherapy Airton Road Tallaght Dublin 24 / IE | For all designated states Wyeth LLC 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [2014/32] |
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states Janssen Alzheimer Immunotherapy Little Island Industrial Estate Little Island, County Cork / IE | ||
For all designated states Wyeth LLC 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | |||
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Janssen Alzheimer Immunotherapy Little Island Industrial Estate Little Island, County Cork / IE | ||
For all designated states Wyeth LLC Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arumugham, Rasappa G. 102 Barton Lane Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | 02 /
Prasad, A. Krishna 105 Worsham Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | 03 /
Hagen, Michael 12 Summit Oaks Pittfords, New York 14534 / US | [2012/38] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
Arumugham, Rasappa G. 102 Barton Lane Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | ||
02 /
Prasad, A. Krishna 105 Worsham Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | Representative(s) | Bullett, Rachel Margaret, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/18] |
Former [2011/25] | Bullett, Rachel Margaret, et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11151428.7 | 17.12.2004 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | US20030530481P | 17.12.2003 Original published format: US 530481 P | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2336147 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2336147 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | [2011/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2336147 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, A61K39/00 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
A61K39/0007 (EP,US);
C07K1/06 (KR);
A61K47/42 (KR);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K47/643 (EP,US);
A61K47/646 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/6031 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6081 (EP,US);
A61K2039/62 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/25] | C07K1/00, A61K47/48, A61K39/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/25] | Extension states | AL | 20.01.2012 | BA | 20.01.2012 | HR | 20.01.2012 | LV | 20.01.2012 | MK | 20.01.2012 | YU | 20.01.2012 | Title | German: | Beta-Immunogen-Peptidträgerkonjugate und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2011/25] | English: | A beta immunogenic peptide carrier conjugates and methods of producing same | [2011/25] | French: | Conjugués transporteur de peptides bêta immunogènes et leurs procédés de production | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 07.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 16.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04817081.5 / EP1699810 | Divisional application(s) | EP12157140.0 / EP2460813 | EP12157147.5 / EP2479184 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040817081) is 16.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.05.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 16.05.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.05.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.04.2014 | EE | 30.04.2014 | LT | 30.04.2014 | MC | 30.04.2014 | [2016/27] |
Former [2015/10] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 30.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9315760 (MOND JAMES J [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * Page 28 line 3-page 29 line 11 from the bottom; page 23 *; | [Y]WO0050077 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOG [BE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * Claims 1 and 7; page 16 *; | [Y]WO0130390 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOG [BE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * Page 7 lines 22-27 *; | [Y]EP1321466 (RANDOX LAB LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph 36 *; | [XP]WO2004083251 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [XP] 1,2,5,8,9,14 * Page 35 line 30-page 38 line 35 *; | [A] - BRUNSWICK M ET AL, "PICOGRAM QUANTITIES OF ANTI-IG ANTIBODIES COUPLED TO DEXTRAN INDUCE B CELL PROLIFERATION", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (19880515), vol. 140, no. 10, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 3364 - 3372, XP002007668 [A] 1-12 * Page 3365, second column, lines 19-21 * | [A] - G.T. HERMANSON, Bioconjugate Techniques, SAN DIEGO, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1996), XP002542294 [A] 1-12 * pages 514-515 * | by applicant | US4235871 | US4501728 | US4666829 | US4673574 | US4837028 | US4902506 | US4912094 | EP0378881 | EP0427347 | US5019369 | US5057540 | WO9118980 | US5078996 | WO9219265 | US5192540 | US5196512 | WO9306121 | WO9313302 | US5229490 | WO9408051 | US5306492 | US5360897 | WO9512608 | WO9530642 | WO9535503 | US5614382 | WO9717163 | WO9717614 | US5723127 | US5736142 | WO9817799 | US5785973 | WO9943839 | WO0018434 | US6113918 | WO0072880 | US6207646 | US6361777 | WO02098368 | WO02098369 | - GOEBEL ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1939), vol. 69, page 53 | - SCHNEERSON ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1984), vol. 45, pages 582 - 591 | - ANDERSON ET AL., J. PEDIATR., (1985), vol. 107, page 346 | - HLSE1 ET AL., J EXP. MED., (1986), vol. 158, page 294 | - SCHNEERSON ET AL., J EXP. MED., (1980), vol. 152, pages 361 - 376 | - CHU ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1983), vol. 40, page 245 | - ANDERSON ET AL., J PEDIATR., (1985), vol. 107, page 346 | - INSEL ET AL., J EXP. MED., (1986), vol. 158, page 294 | - GLENNER; WONG, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1984), vol. 120, page 1131 | - HARDY, TINS, (1984), vol. 20, page 1131 | - HARDY, TINS, (1977), vol. 20, page 154 | - HARDY, TINS, (1997), vol. 20, page 154 | - HARD ET AL., TINS, (1997), vol. 20, pages 155 - 158 | - ANDERSON ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 168, pages 3697 - 3701 | - SENIOR, LANCET NEUROL., (2002), vol. 1, page 3 | - CARLSSON, J ET AL., BIOCHEM J, (1978), vol. 173, page 723 | - IMMUNO. REV., (1982), vol. 62, page 85 | - SZOKA ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOPHYS. BIOENG., (1980), vol. 9, page 467 | - HOLCOMB ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (1998), vol. 4, pages 97 - 11 | - BARD ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (2000), vol. 6, pages 916 - 919 | - MASLIAH E ET AL., J NEUROSCI. 15, vol. 16, no. 18, pages 5795 - 811 | - FANSELOW, ANIM. LEARN. BEHAV., (1990), vol. 18, pages 264 - 270 | - WEHNER ET AL., NATURE GENET., (1997), vol. 17, pages 331 - 334 | - CALDARONE ET AL., NATURE GENET., (1997), vol. 17, pages 335 - 337 | - JOHNSON-WOOD ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, page 1550 | - MASLIAH E; ROCKENSTEIN E., JNEURAL TRANSM SUPPL., (2000), vol. 59, pages 175 - 83 | - HSIAO ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 274, pages 99 - 102 | - DUFF ET AL., NATURE, (1996), vol. 383, pages 710 - 713 | - MASLIAH E; ROCKENSTEIN E., JNEURAL 1RANSM SUPPL., (2000), vol. 59, pages 175 - 83 | - BERNATOWICZ, M.S.; MATSUEDA, G.R., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1986), vol. 155, pages 95 - 102 | - KNISKERN, P.J.; MARBURG, S., Development and Clinical Uses of Haemophilus b Conjugate Vaccines: Conjugation: Design, Chemistry, and Analysis, MARCEL DEKKER, INC, (1994), pages 37 - 70 | - ARRIZON, V.; BIECHLER, R.; CUMMINGS, J.; HARBAUGH, J., High-Performance Liquid Chromatography of Peptide and Proteins: Separation, Analysis, and Conformation, CRC PRESS, (1991), pages 859 - 863 | - CARLSSON, J. ET AL., BIOCHEM J, (1978), vol. 173, page 723 | - MEANS, G.E.; CANGDON, W.I.; BENDER, M.I., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1972), vol. 11, pages 3564 - 3574 | - HARDY, TRENDS IN NEUROSCIENCES, (1984), vol. 20, page 1131 | - HARDY, TRENDS IN NEUROSCIENCES, (1977), vol. 20, page 154 | - STOUTE ET AL., N. ENGL. J MED., (1997), vol. 336, pages 86 - 91 | - GOEBEL ET AL., J EXP. MED., (1939), vol. 69, page 5 3 | - SCHNEERSON ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1980), vol. 152, pages 361 - 376 | - BERNATOWICZ, M. S.; MATSUEDA, G. R., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1986), vol. 155, pages 95 - 102 | - ARRIZON, V.; BIECHLER, R.; CUMMINGS, J.; HARBAUGH, J., High-Performance Liquid Chromatography ofPeptide and Proteins: Separation, Analysis, and Conformation, CRC PRESS, (1991), pages 859 - 863 | US20030530481 |