EP2456292 - Mounting apparatus for fans [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd. 66, Chung Shan Road Tu-cheng City, Taipei Hsien / TW | For all designated states Hong Fu Jin Precision Industry (ShenZhen) Co., Ltd. No. 2, 2nd Donghuan Road Longhua Town, Bao'an District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518109 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd. 66 Chung Shan Road Tu-cheng City, Taipei Hsien / TW | ||
For all designated states Hong Fu Jin Precision Industry (ShenZhen) Co., (ShenZhen) Co., Ltd. No. 2, 2nd Donghuan Road Longhua Town, Bao'an District Shenzhen City Guangdong 518109 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhang, Guang-Yi Hong Fu Jin Precision Industry (ShenZhen) Co., Ltd No.2, 2nd Donghuan Road Longhua Town Bao'an District 518109, Shenzhen Guangdong / CN | 02 /
Fu, Jia-Qi Hong Fu Jin Precision Industry (ShenZhen) Co., Ltd No.2, 2nd Donghuan Road Longhua Town Bao'an District 518109, Shenzhen Guangdong / CN | 03 /
Zhou, Hai-Chen Hong Fu Jin Precision Industry (ShenZhen) Co., Ltd No.2, 2nd Donghuan Road Longhua Town Bao'an District 518109, Shenzhen City Guangdong / CN | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Peter Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Wilson, Peter Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11151673.8 | 21.01.2011 | [2012/21] | Priority number, date | CN20101549460 | 18.11.2010 Original published format: CN201010549460 | [2012/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2456292 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
H05K7/20727 (EP,US);
H05K7/20172 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Montagevorrichtung für Ventilatoren | [2012/21] | English: | Mounting apparatus for fans | [2012/21] | French: | Appareil d'assemblage pour ventilateurs | [2012/21] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 01.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 24.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006003683 (CHEN SHIH-TSUNG [TW]) [I] 1-17 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0030] , [0031] , [0032] *; | [A]US2005243513 (CHOU YI-LUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * figure 2 * |