EP2369011 - Use of micro-RNA for diagnosing acute megakaryoblastic leukaemia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/39] | Microrna fingerprints during human megakaryocytopoiesis | ||
[2014/07] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Ohio State University Research Foundation 1524 North High Street Columbus, OH 43201 / US | [2013/31] |
Former [2011/39] | For all designated states The Ohio State University Research Foundation 1960 Kenny Road Columbus, OH 43210-1063 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Croce, Carlo M. 2140 Cambridge Boulevard Colombus, OH 43221 / US | 02 /
Calin, George A. 12210 Willow Brook Lane Pearland, TX 77584 / US | 03 /
Garzon, Ramiro 2705 Coventry Road Colombus, OH 43221 / US | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | Turner, Craig Robert AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Turner, Craig Robert A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 11151749.6 | 19.03.2007 | [2011/39] | Priority number, date | US20060743585P | 20.03.2006 Original published format: US 743585 P | [2011/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2369011 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12N15/1135 (US);
A61K31/7105 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
C12N15/113 (US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6883, C12Q2525/207 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/39] | Title | German: | Verwendung von mikro-RNA zur Diagnose von akuter megakaryoblastischer Leukaemie | [2014/07] | English: | Use of micro-RNA for diagnosing acute megakaryoblastic leukaemia | [2014/07] | French: | L`utilisation de micro-ARN pour le diagnotic de la leucemie aigue megakaryoblastique | [2014/07] |
Former [2011/39] | Miko-RNA-Fingerabdrücke während humaner Megakaryozytopoiese | ||
Former [2011/39] | Microrna fingerprints during human megakaryocytopoiesis | ||
Former [2011/39] | Empreintes digitales micro-ARN pendant une mégacaryocytopoïese | Examination procedure | 28.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 10.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/47] | 04.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07753450.1 / EP1996731 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2005078139 (UNIV JEFFERSON [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * para. 46-47, 53, claims *; | [XY]WO2005118806 (AMBION INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,11,12 * the whole document * * p. 2, ll. 26-27, p. 20, l. 26 - p. 21, l. 3; Example 30, p. 99, ll. 23-28 * [Y] 3,7,8,10,13-15; | [XPY]WO2006137941 (AMBION INC [US], et al) [XP] 1,2,4,5,9,11-13 * the whole document * * p. 15, l. 6 - p. 16, l. 19, p. 17, ll. 19-29, p. 20, ll. 16-28, p. 21, ll. 26-30, p. 25, ll. 9-23 * [Y] 3,6-8,10,14,15; | [E]WO2007081680 (UNIV OHIO STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [E] 1,2,4,11-13,15 * the whole document * * p. 3, l. 25 - p. 4, l. 9, p. 8, l. 31 - p. 9, l. 8, p. 10, ll. 14-19 * * p. 11, ll. 21-25, p. 80, l. 21 - p. 82, l. 14 *; | [Y] - ARNAULD C VERSCHUUR, "Acute megakaryoblastic leukemia", INTERNET CITATION, (200405), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://www.orpha.net/data/patho/GB/uk-AMLM7.pdf, (20110622), XP002643496 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [XP] - GARZON RAMIRO ET AL, "JicroRNA fingerprints during human megakaryocytopoiesis", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20060328), vol. 103, no. 13, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0600587103, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5078 - 5083, XP002465978 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0600587103 | by applicant | US519941 | US4235871 | US4501728 | US4837028 | US4920016 | US4987071 | US5019369 | US5252479 | WO9324641 | WO9413788 | US5427916 | US5849902 | US2002086356 | US2002173478 | US2004014113 | US2004018176 | - BARTEL, D.P., CELL, (2004), vol. 116, pages 281 - 297 | - AMBROS, V., NATURE, (2004), vol. 431, pages 350 - 355 | - XU, P. ET AL., CURR. BIOL., (2003), vol. 13, pages 790 - 795 | - CHENG, A.M. ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (2005), vol. 33, pages 1290 - 1297 | - POY, M.N. ET AL., NATURE, (2004), vol. 432, pages 226 - 230 | - DRESIOS, J. ET AL., PROO. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2005), vol. 102, pages 1865 - 1870 | - CALIN, G.A ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 1554 - 15529 | - CALIN, G.A. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2004), vol. 101, pages 11755 - 11760 | - HE, L. ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, pages 828 - 833 | - LU, J. ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, pages 834 - 838 | - CHEN, C.Z. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 303, pages 83 - 86 | - MONTICELLI, S. ET AL., GENOME BIOLOGY 6, (2005), page R71 | - FELLI, N. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (2005), vol. 102, pages 18081 - 18086 | - FOLLI, N. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA., (2005), vol. 102, pages 18081 - 18086 | - FAZI, F. ET AL., CELL, (2005), vol. 123, pages 819 - 831 | - METZLER M. ET AL., GENES CHROMOSOMES AND CANCER, (2004), vol. 39, pages 167 - 169 | - RIGBY ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1977), vol. 113, pages 237 - 251 | - FIENBERG ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1983), vol. 132, pages 6 - 13 | - HANAMURA, I. ET AL., JPN. J. CANCER RES., (2001), vol. 92, no. 6, pages 38 - 644 | - ZHANG, X. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 278, no. 9, pages 7580 - 7590 | - ZENG ET AL., MOLECULAR CELL, (2002), vol. 9, pages 1327 - 1333 | - TUSCHL, NAT. BIOTECHNOL, (2002), vol. 20, pages 446 - 448 | - BRUMMELKAMP ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 550 - 553 | - MIYAGISHI ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 497 - 500 | - PADDISON ET AL., GENES DEV., (2002), vol. 16, pages 948 - 958 | - LEE ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 500 - 505 | - PAUL ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 505 - 508 | - RABINOWITZ, J.E. ET AL., J. VIROL, (2002), vol. 76, pages 791 - 801 | - DORNBURG, GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 2, pages 301 - 310 | - EGLITIS, BIOIECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 608 - 614 | - MILLER, HUM, GENE THERAPY, (1990), vol. 1, pages 5 - 14 | - ANDERSON, NATURE, (1998), vol. 392, pages 25 - 30 | - XIA ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (2002), vol. 20, pages 1006 - 1010 | - SAMULSKI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1987), vol. 61, pages 3096 - 3 101 | - FISHER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1996), vol. 70, pages 520 - 532 | - SAMULSKI ET AL., J. VIRAL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 3822 - 3826 | - WERNER; UHLENBECK, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1995), vol. 23, pages 2092 - 96 | - HAMMANN ET AL., ANTISENSE ANDNUCLEICACID DRUG DEV., (1999), vol. 9, pages 25 - 31 | - SZOKA ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOPHYS. BIOENG., (1980), vol. 9, page 467 | - GABIZON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., U.S.A., (1988), vol. 18, pages 6949 - 53 | - TAJIMA, S. ET AL., J EXP. MED., (1996), vol. 184, pages 1357 - 1364 | - LIU, C.G. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 101, pages 9740 - 9744 | - CHEN, C. ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES, (2005), vol. 33, page E179 | - ELAGIB, K.E. ET AL., BLOOD, (2003), vol. 101, pages 4333 - 4341 | - ATHANASOIU, M. ET AL., CELL GROWTH DIFFER., (1996), vol. 7, pages 1525 - 1534 | - CASELIA, I. ET AL., BLOOD, (2003), vol. 101, pages 1316 - 1323 | - HOCK, H. ET AL., GENES DEV., (2004), vol. 18, pages 2336 - 2341 | - BEGLEY, C.G.; GREEN, A.R., BLOOD, (1999), vol. 93, pages 2760 - 2770 | - JACKERS, P. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, pages 52183 - 52190 | - LANNUTTI, B.J. ET AL., EXP. HEMATOL., (2003), vol. 12, pages 1268 - 1274 | - SEVINSKY, J.R. ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 24, pages 4534 - 4545 | - MANSFIELD, J.H. ET AL., NATURE, (2004), vol. 36, pages 1079 - 1083 | - TANZER, A. ET AL., J. EXP. ' ZOOL. B MOL. DEV. EVOL., (2005), vol. 304B, pages 75 - 85 | - YEKTA, S. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 304, pages 594 - 596 | - LIM, L.P. ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 433, pages 769 - 771 | - PILLAI, R., RNA, (2005), vol. 11, pages 1753 - 1761 | - NAKAO, M. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2004), vol. 125, pages 709 - 719 | - SONG, W.J. ET AL., NAT. GENET., (1999), vol. 23, pages 166 - 175 |