EP2353692 - Filter device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE International GmbH Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states MAHLE International GmbH Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gänswein, Matthias Kolpingstrasse 51 73732 Esslingen / DE | 02 /
Layer, Markus J. F. Weisshaar-Straße 28 71404 Korb / DE | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | BRP Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11152182.9 | 26.01.2011 | [2011/32] | Priority number, date | DE20101005980 | 28.01.2010 Original published format: DE102010005980 | [2011/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2353692 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2353692 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/96, B01D35/16, F02M37/22, B01D35/153 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
B01D35/153 (EP,US);
B01D35/16 (EP);
F02M37/42 (EP,US);
B01D2201/291 (EP);
B01D2201/316 (EP);
B01D2201/34 (EP);
B01D2201/4007 (EP);
B01D2201/4046 (EP);
B01D2201/4084 (EP);
B01D2201/52 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/32] | B01D29/96, B01D35/16, F02M37/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Filtereinrichtung | [2011/32] | English: | Filter device | [2011/32] | French: | Dispositif de filtre | [2011/32] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 03.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/07] | 12.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19951085 (MAHLE FILTERSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]FR2884728 (FILTRAUTO SA [FR]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [XI]US2009301950 (WEINDORF MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0013] , [0 18]; figures 1, 6; claim 1 * [I] 2,6-9; | [E]EP2314364 (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) [E] 1,3-5,10 * paragraphs [0013] - [0017]; figures 1-4; claims 1, 4 * |